EP2335382 - SCHEDULING POLICY AND QUALITY OF SERVICE THROUGH THE PRESENCE ACCESS LAYER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.11.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.11.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.12.2016 [2016/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA | [2013/48] |
Former [2013/36] | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo ON N2L 3W8 / CA | ||
Former [2011/25] | For all designated states RESEARCH IN MOTION LIMITED 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUNG, Michael Hin Kai 82 Ardagh Street Toronto, Ontario M6S 1Y5 / CA | 02 /
ROGERS, Jeff 147 Catalina Drive Scarborough, Ontario M1E 1B3 / CA | 03 /
SO, Sin-Hang 7 Crossroads Drive Richmond Hill, Ontario L4E 5E3 / CA | [2011/25] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/25] | Patel, Binesh Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09820131.2 | 27.02.2009 | [2011/25] | WO2009CA00227 | Priority number, date | US20080106053P | 16.10.2008 Original published format: US 106053 P | [2011/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010043017 | Date: | 22.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2335382 | Date: | 22.06.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 22.04.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/26, H04L12/12, H04W28/24, H04W4/02, H04W8/22, H04L12/70, H04L12/24, // H04L29/08 | [2016/22] | CPC: |
H04L41/5003 (EP,US);
H04L67/54 (EP,US);
H04L67/61 (EP,US);
H04L41/0893 (US)
|
Former IPC [2014/04] | H04L12/26, H04L12/12, H04W28/24, H04W4/02, H04W8/22, H04L12/70 | ||
Former IPC [2011/25] | H04L12/26, H04L12/12, H04W28/24, H04W4/02, H04W8/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/25] | Title | German: | TERMINIERUNGSRICHTLINIE UND DIENSTQUALITÄT DURCH EINE PRÄSENZZUGANGSSCHICHT | [2011/25] | English: | SCHEDULING POLICY AND QUALITY OF SERVICE THROUGH THE PRESENCE ACCESS LAYER | [2011/25] | French: | POLITIQUE D'ORDONNANCEMENT ET QUALITÉ DE SERVICE PAR L'INTERMÉDIAIRE DE LA COUCHE D'ACCÈS À LA PRÉSENCE | [2011/25] | Entry into regional phase | 18.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 18.04.2011 | Search fee paid | 18.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CA | 18.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/25] | 11.11.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003074443 (MELAKU MAKONNEN [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0066]; figures 1-12; claims 1-40 *; | [A]EP1549013 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1592196 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0023]; figures 1-5; claims 1,2,6,10 *; | [X]US2006286993 (XIE QIAOBING [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraphs [0024] , [0027] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0056]; figures 1-4; claims 1-18 *; | [A]US2007253340 (VARNEY DOUGLAS W [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraphs [0033] , [0035] - paragraph [0040]; figures 1,2; claims 1-18 *; | [X]US2008162637 (ADAMCZYK MARIA [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0077] * * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0093] * * paragraph [0095] - paragraph [0104] * * paragraph [0107] - paragraph [0109] * * paragraph [0113] - paragraph [0122] * * paragraph [0141] - paragraph [0147] * * paragraph [0151] - paragraph [0171] * * paragraph [0177] - paragraph [0181] * * paragraphs [0185] , [0188] - paragraph [0190] * * paragraph [0192] - paragraph [0196] * * paragraph [0200] - paragraph [0203] * * paragraph [0205] - paragraph [0212] * * paragraph [0217] * * paragraph [0234] - paragraph [0249] * * paragraph [0253] - paragraph [0262] * * paragraphs [0275] , [0279] - paragraph [0280] * * paragraphs [0347] , [0348] , [0368] - paragraph [0378] * * paragraph [0385] - paragraph [0396] * * paragraph [0418] - paragraph [0420] * * paragraph [0472] - paragraph [0482] * * paragraph [0486] - paragraph [0490]; figures 1-4,9-12,14-18,20-25; claims 1-20 *; | [A] - 3GPP, "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; Presence Service; Architecture and Functional Description (Release 6)", 3GPP TS 23.141 V0.0.0, XX, XX, (20020601), page complete, XP002243553 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | International search | [A]EP1592196 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]); | [A]US2006215633 (JENNINGS CULLEN F [US], et al); | [A]EP1715657 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]); | [X]US2006286993 (XIE QIAOBING [US], et al); | [A]US2007253340 (VARNEY DOUGLAS W [US], et al) |