EP2347651 - FISHING LINE HAVING INTEGRATED COMPOSITE YARN CONTAINING SHORT FIBERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.11.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Y.G.K CO., LTD. 986-2 Fukuraotsu Minamiawaji-shi Hyogo 656-0502 / JP | [2011/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKANISHI, Shigeru c/o Y.G.K CO. LTD. 986-2, Fukuraotsu Minamiawaji-shi Hyogo 656-0502 / JP | [2017/02] |
Former [2011/30] | 01 /
NAKANISHI, Shigeru c/o Y.G.K CO. LTD. 986-2, Fukuraotsu Minamiawaji-shi Hyogo 656-0502 / JP | Representative(s) | Teipel, Stephan, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | [2017/02] |
Former [2011/30] | Teipel, Stephan, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09820419.1 | 13.10.2009 | [2011/30] | WO2009JP05305 | Priority number, date | JP20080265128 | 14.10.2008 Original published format: JP 2008265128 | [2011/30] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010044241 | Date: | 22.04.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2347651 | Date: | 27.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2347651 | Date: | 11.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.04.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A01K91/00, D02G3/44 | [2013/45] | CPC: |
A01K91/00 (EP,KR,US);
D02G3/36 (KR,US);
D02G3/40 (US);
D02G3/408 (KR);
D02G3/44 (KR,US);
D02G3/444 (EP,KR,US);
D07B2501/2038 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/30] | A01K91/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/02] |
Former [2011/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANGELSCHNUR MIT INTEGRIERTER VERBUNDGARNSTRUKTUR MIT KURZFASERN | [2011/30] | English: | FISHING LINE HAVING INTEGRATED COMPOSITE YARN CONTAINING SHORT FIBERS | [2011/30] | French: | LIGNE DE PÊCHE COMPORTANT UN FIL COMPOSITE INTÉGRÉ CONTENANT DES FIBRES COURTES | [2011/30] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2011 | Translation filed | 18.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2011 | Search fee paid | 18.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/30] | 03.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.11.2015 | Opposition(s) | 12.10.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.10.2009 | AT | 11.01.2017 | CY | 11.01.2017 | CZ | 11.01.2017 | DK | 11.01.2017 | EE | 11.01.2017 | ES | 11.01.2017 | FI | 11.01.2017 | HR | 11.01.2017 | LT | 11.01.2017 | LV | 11.01.2017 | MC | 11.01.2017 | MK | 11.01.2017 | PL | 11.01.2017 | RO | 11.01.2017 | SE | 11.01.2017 | SI | 11.01.2017 | SK | 11.01.2017 | SM | 11.01.2017 | TR | 11.01.2017 | BG | 11.04.2017 | NO | 11.04.2017 | GR | 12.04.2017 | IS | 11.05.2017 | PT | 11.05.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 13.10.2009 | |
AT | 11.01.2017 | ||
CY | 11.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
MK | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
SM | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 13.10.2009 | |
AT | 11.01.2017 | ||
CY | 11.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
SM | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 13.10.2009 | |
AT | 11.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
SM | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
SM | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
SM | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
SM | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]WO2009116381 (Y G K CO LTD [JP]; NAKANISHI SHIGERU [JP]) [XP] 1-15,22,23 * paragraphs [0027] , [ 0043] , [ 0046] , [ 0049] , [ 0050]; claims 1-16, 27 *; | [A]JP2003134979 (YOTSUAMI KK) [A] 1,2,14,16-21 * paragraphs [0006] , [ 0032] , [ 0043] , [ 0048]; claim 1 * * abstract *; | [A]US3623397 (HAYASHI HISASHI ET AL) [A] 1-23 * column 1, line 34 - column 1, line 38 * * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 3 * * column 5, line 26 - column 5, line 31 * * figures 2-3 *; | [A]FR2652826 (DEBOISSY SA [FR]) [A] 1-23 * figure 1; claims 1, 3 * | International search | [A]JPH093742 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [A]JP2007135500 (TORAY MONOFILAMENT CO); | [A]JP2006314324 (YOTSUAMI KK); | [AP]WO2009116381 (Y G K CO LTD [JP], et al) | Examination | US2007269654 | US5659994 | by applicant | JPH0931786 | JPH08140538 | JP2004308047 | JP2003116431 | JPH04335849 | JPS555228 | JPS55107506 | JP2004051661 |