EP2347369 - NON-INVASIVE WOUND PREVENTION, DETECTION, AND ANALYSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.02.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.03.2019 [2019/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Papaioannou, George 925 W. Montclair Avenue Glendale, WI 53217 / US | [2011/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2011/30] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/30] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09820882.0 | 13.10.2009 | [2011/30] | WO2009US05594 | Priority number, date | US20080104968P | 13.10.2008 Original published format: US 104968 P | [2011/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010044845 | Date: | 22.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2347369 | Date: | 27.07.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00 | [2011/30] | CPC: |
A61B5/0064 (EP,US);
A61B5/445 (EP,US);
G06T7/521 (EP,US);
A61B5/0059 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10004 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30004 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30096 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/30] | Title | German: | NICHTINVASIVE WUNDPRÄVENTION, NACHWEIS UND ANALYSE | [2011/30] | English: | NON-INVASIVE WOUND PREVENTION, DETECTION, AND ANALYSIS | [2011/30] | French: | PROCÉDÉ NON VULNÉRANT DE PRÉVENTION, DE DÉTECTION ET D'ANALYSE D'UNE PLAIE | [2011/30] | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.2011 | Search fee paid | 13.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/30] | 28.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/11] | 19.06.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2011 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   20.04.2012 | 31.10.2012 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   15.07.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2004009459 (ANDERSON JAMES H [US], et al); | [Y]US6567682 (OSTERWEIL JOSEF [US], et al); | [Y]US2003231788 (YUKHIN ARTIOM [RU], et al); | [Y]US2008004521 (HUNDLEY WILLIAM G [US], et al); | [Y]US2006154198 (DURBIN DUANE [US], et al) |