EP2334701 - FULLY HUMAN ANTIBODIES TO HIGH MOLECULAR WEIGHT-MELANOMA ASSOCIATED ANTIGEN AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.11.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Pittsburgh of the Commonwealth System of Higher Education Office of Technology Management 200 Gardner Steel Conference Center Thackeray and O'Hara Streets Pittsburgh, PA 15260 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2011/25] | For all designated states University of Pittsburgh of the Commonwealth System of Higher Education Office of Technology Management 200 Gardner Steel Conference Center Thackeray and O'Hara Streets Pittsburgh, PA 15260 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Xinhui 213 Park Square Lane Pittsburgh, PA 15238 / US | 02 /
FERRONE, Soldano 5443 Albermarle Avenue Pittsburgh, PA 15217 / US | [2011/25] | Representative(s) | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance, et al Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/13] | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance, et al Forrester & Boehmert SkyGarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/25] | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09821279.8 | 15.10.2009 | [2011/25] | WO2009US60903 | Priority number, date | US20080106055P | 16.10.2008 Original published format: US 106055 P | [2011/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010045495 | Date: | 22.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2334701 | Date: | 22.06.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 29.07.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/18, G01N33/574 | [2011/25] | CPC: |
C07K16/3053 (EP,US);
A61K39/00119 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
C07K14/705 (US);
C07K16/30 (EP,US);
G01N33/57423 (EP,US);
G01N33/5743 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
C07H21/00 (EP,US);
C07K2317/21 (EP,US);
C07K2317/56 (EP,US);
C07K2317/622 (EP,US);
C07K2317/73 (EP,US);
C07K2317/75 (EP,US);
C07K2317/76 (EP,US);
C12N15/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/25] | Title | German: | VOLLSTÄNDIG MENSCHLICHE ANTIKÖRPER GEGEN MIT MELANOMEN VON HOHEM MOLEKULARGEWICHT ASSOZIIERTE ANTIGENE UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2011/25] | English: | FULLY HUMAN ANTIBODIES TO HIGH MOLECULAR WEIGHT-MELANOMA ASSOCIATED ANTIGEN AND USES THEREOF | [2011/25] | French: | ANTICORPS ENTIÈREMENT HUMAINS DIRIGÉS CONTRE UN ANTIGÈNE ASSOCIÉ AU MÉLANOME DE MASSE MOLÉCULAIRE ÉLEVÉE ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2011/25] | Entry into regional phase | 05.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 05.04.2011 | Search fee paid | 05.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/25] | 21.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/52] | 20.11.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.12.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO0038515 (NEW YORK MEDICAL COLLEGE [US], et al); | by applicant | US4036945 | US4235871 | US4331647 | US4458066 | US4501728 | US4689401 | US4837028 | US4892827 | US4902505 | WO9005719 | US4946778 | US4957735 | US5004697 | US5019369 | US5055303 | US5061620 | US5079163 | US5188837 | US5254342 | US5268164 | US5271961 | EP0606046 | US5413797 | WO9519970 | WO9521613 | US5506206 | US5512658 | US5514670 | US5534496 | WO9627583 | WO9633172 | US5585089 | US5587458 | US5602095 | US5608039 | WO9713760 | EP0780386 | WO9722596 | WO9732856 | WO9802434 | WO9802438 | WO9802437 | WO9803516 | WO9807697 | WO9814451 | US5747498 | WO9830566 | WO9833768 | US5792783 | WO9834918 | WO9834915 | US5821238 | US5834504 | WO9850356 | WO9854093 | US5854044 | US5861510 | US5863949 | US5877305 | WO9910349 | US5883113 | US5886020 | WO9916755 | WO9924440 | WO9929667 | WO9935146 | WO9935132 | EP0931788 | WO9951643 | WO9952910 | WO9952889 | WO9961422 | US2005214304 | WO2006074071 | US7081518 | EP19970304971 | WO1998IB01113 | US19990117341 | US19990117346 | EP19990302232 | WO1999IB00797 | EP19990308617 |