EP2362785 - APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR DISINFECTING SPACES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.07.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TBS Technologies, LLC 68 Briarcliff Lane Holliston, MA 01746 / US | [2011/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARSON, William, W. 14 Schofield Road Hopkinton, MA 01748 / US | 02 /
SABIN, Paul 14 Hunnewell Street Needham, MA 02194 / US | 03 /
DEE, Thomas, J. 68 Briarcliff Lane Holliston, MA 01746 / US | [2011/36] | Representative(s) | Adam, Holger Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/03] | Adam, Holger Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/36] | Maschio, Antonio, et al Maschio & Soames LLP 20 Carlton Crescent Southampton, SO15 2ET / GB | ||
Former [2011/45] | Perkins, Dawn Elizabeth, et al Edwards Wildman Innovations LLP 10 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EZ / GB | ||
Former [2011/36] | Perkins, Dawn Elizabeth Edwards Angell Palmer & Dodge UK Innovations LLP 10 Carlton Crescent GB-Southampton SO15 2EZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09821368.9 | 16.10.2009 | WO2009US61098 | Priority number, date | US20080105991P | 16.10.2008 Original published format: US 105991 P | [2011/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010045619 | Date: | 22.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2362785 | Date: | 07.09.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.04.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61L2/20, A61L9/015, A61L2/24 | [2012/26] | CPC: |
A61L2/20 (EP,US);
A61L2/24 (EP,US);
A61L9/015 (EP,US);
A61L2202/121 (EP,US);
A61L2202/13 (EP,US);
A61L2202/14 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/36] | A61L2/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR RAUMDESINFEKTION | [2011/36] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR DISINFECTING SPACES | [2011/36] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉS DE DÉSINFECTION D'ESPACES | [2011/36] | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.2011 | Search fee paid | 13.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/36] | 12.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/31] | 14.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.09.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2005019210 (ROSENBLATT ARON A [US], et al) [I] 1,2,6,9-13,15 * paragraphs [0014] - [0018] *; | [I]US2008139869 (WILSON DEBORAH E [US], et al) [I] 1,2,4,6,9-15 * paragraphs [0007] - [0009] - [0042] , [0052] , [0055] , [0063] - [0066] - [0069] , [0072] , [0074] , [0077] , [0080] , [0087] , [0088] , [0097] , [0104] , [0105] * * paragraphs [0117] - [0119]; figures 1,4 *; | [A]US2005084415 (MCVEY IAIN F [US], et al) [A] 1,10 * paragraphs [0033] - [0035] - [0054] - [0058] - [0061] , [0062] , [0071]; figure - *; | [A]US2005220662 (HEDMAN DAVID E [US]) [A] 1,10 * paragraphs [0018] , [0019] , [0044] , [0048] , [0057] , [0060] - [0063] - [0067] , [0070] - [0074] - [0085] * | International search | [X]US6235240 (HEREDIA LEON M [US], et al); | [Y]US4335075 (KACKOS EDWARD M); | [Y]US2005019210 (ROSENBLATT ARON A [US], et al); | [Y]US2001053667 (KREICHAUF RUTH D [US]) |