Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8756302 | Global Dossier | 17.06.2014 | B2 | US2011219118 | 08.09.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009CA01550 | 22.10.2009 | US10755708 | 22.10.2008 | US200913125661 | 22.10.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2350829 | Global Dossier | 10.04.2019 | B1 | EP2350829 | 03.08.2016 | A4 | EP2350829 | 03.08.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009CA01550 | 22.10.2009 | US10755708 | 22.10.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2741465 | 15.10.2013 | C | CA2741465 | 29.04.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009CA01550 | 22.10.2009 | US10755708 | 22.10.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010045744 | Global Dossier | 29.04.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10755708 | 22.10.2008 |