EP2356989 - STABLE TABLET CONTAINING 4,5-EPOXYMORPHINAN DERIVATIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.12.2018 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.01.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8666 / JP | [2011/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OHTA, Kotoe c/o Basic Research Laboratories Toray Industries Inc. 10-1 Tebiro 6-chome Kamakura-shi Kanagawa 248-8555 / JP | 02 /
TAKAKI, Suguru c/o Basic Research Laboratories Toray Industries Inc. 10-1 Tebiro 6-chome Kamakura-shi Kanagawa 248-8555 / JP | 03 /
HORIUCHI, Yasuhide c/o Basic Research Laboratories Toray Industries Inc. 10-1 Tebiro 6-chome Kamakura-shi Kanagawa 248-8555 / JP | [2018/06] |
Former [2011/33] | 01 /
OHTA, Kotoe c/o Basic Research Laboratories Toray Industries Inc. 10-1 Tebiro 6-chome Kamakura-shi Kanagawa 248-8555 / JP | ||
02 /
TAKAKI, Suguru c/o Basic Research Laboratories Toray Industries Inc. 10-1 Tebiro 6-chome Kamakura-shi Kanagawa 248-8555 / JP | |||
03 /
HORIUCHI, Yasuhide c/o Basic Research Laboratories Toray Industries Inc. 10-1 Tebiro 6-chome Kamakura-shi Kanagawa 248-8555 / JP | Representative(s) | Kador & Partner Part mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/06] | Kador & Partner Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/33] | Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09822078.3 | 23.10.2009 | [2011/33] | WO2009JP68228 | Priority number, date | JP20080274579 | 24.10.2008 Original published format: JP 2008274579 | [2011/33] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010047381 | Date: | 29.04.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2356989 | Date: | 17.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2356989 | Date: | 07.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.04.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/485, A61K9/20 | [2017/37] | CPC: |
A61K9/2059 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/20 (KR);
A61K31/485 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/1623 (KR,US);
A61K9/1676 (KR,US);
A61K9/2009 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/18] | A61K31/485, A61K9/20, A61K9/28, A61P17/04, A61K9/00 | ||
Former IPC [2011/33] | A61K31/485, A61K9/20, A61K9/28, A61K47/02, A61K47/26, A61K47/32, A61K47/36, A61P17/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/06] |
Former [2011/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STABILE TABLETTE MIT 4,5-EPOXYMORPHINAN-DERIVAT | [2011/33] | English: | STABLE TABLET CONTAINING 4,5-EPOXYMORPHINAN DERIVATIVE | [2011/33] | French: | COMPRIMÉ STABLE CONTENANT UN DÉRIVÉ DE 4,5-ÉPOXYMORPHINANE | [2011/33] | Entry into regional phase | 05.05.2011 | Translation filed | 05.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 05.05.2011 | Search fee paid | 05.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/33] | 29.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.12.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.09.2017 | Opposition(s) | 08.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 07.02.2018 | EE | 07.02.2018 | HR | 07.02.2018 | LT | 07.02.2018 | LV | 07.02.2018 | MC | 07.02.2018 | MK | 07.02.2018 | SI | 07.02.2018 | SK | 07.02.2018 | SM | 07.02.2018 | BG | 07.05.2018 | NO | 07.05.2018 | IS | 07.06.2018 | LU | 23.10.2018 | MT | 23.10.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/08] | CY | 07.02.2018 | |
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
MC | 07.02.2018 | ||
SI | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
SM | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
LU | 23.10.2018 | ||
MT | 23.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | CY | 07.02.2018 | |
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
MC | 07.02.2018 | ||
SI | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
SM | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
LU | 23.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/28] | CY | 07.02.2018 | |
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
MC | 07.02.2018 | ||
SI | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
SM | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | CY | 07.02.2018 | |
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
SI | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
SM | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 07.02.2018 | |
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
SM | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CY | 07.02.2018 | |
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/41] | CY | 07.02.2018 | |
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 07.02.2018 | |
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]EP0948965 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [I] 1-6 * the whole document * [Y] 1-6; | [I]US6572891 (UGARKOVIC SONJA JOVAN [MK]) [I] 1-6 * abstract * * column 3, line 5 - line 8 * * column 5, line 12 - line 18; examples 1-5 *; | [I]US2007196494 (GRENIER ARNAUD [FR], et al) [I] 1-6 * abstract *; | [I]WO2008015220 (ETHYPHARM SA [FR], et al) [I] 1-6 * abstract * * page 19, line 1 - line 16; examples 2,4,8,10 *; | [Y] - S Edge, RW Miller, "Sodium Starch Glycolate", Handbook of Pharmaceutical Excipients, London, Pharmaceutical Press, (2006), pages 701 - 704, ISBN 0 85369 618 7, XP002694443 [Y] 1-6 * Section 11 Stability and Storage Conditions * | International search | WO9902158 [ ] (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP], et al); | EP0948965 [ ] (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]); | US2001004637 [ ] (HANAMURA NOBUYUKI [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2005002123 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) | [Y] - JAPAN PHARMACEUTICAL EXCIPIENTS COUNCIL, IYAKUHIN TENKABUTSU JITEN, (1994), page 31, 46 | by applicant | JPH02160719 | WO9315081 | JP2525552B | WO9747287 | WO9835679 | WO9902158 | JP2002302446 | JP3531170B | WO2004091623 | JP2005531515 | WO2006038661 | JP2007056011 | JP2007224021 | - "Kolldon Polyvnylpyrrolidon for the pharmaceutical industry", VOLKER BUEHLER, BASF brochure, (199308), pages 186 - 187 | - PATRICIA VAN ARNUM, "Advancing ODT Technology", PHARMACEUTICAL TECHNOLOGY, (20071002), vol. 3, no. 10, pages 66 - 76 |