EP2339178 - SUCTION MUFFLER FOR HERMETIC COMPRESSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.04.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero, Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/08] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero, Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul, 07336 / KR | ||
Former [2011/26] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yoido-Dong Yongdungpo-Gu Seoul 150-010 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JUNG, Min-Kyu 513 Gwisan-dong Changwon-si Gyeongsangnam-do 641-410 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Hyo-Jae 155-2 Jungang-dong Changwon-si Gyeongsangnam-do 641-030 / KR | 03 /
PARK, Bok-Ann 503-1702 Gimhaejangyu7cha Prugio Apt. Sammun-ri Jangyu-myeon Gimhae-si Gyeongsangnam-do 621-831 / KR | [2017/24] |
Former [2011/26] | 01 /
JUNG, Min-Kyu 513 Gwisan-dong Changwon-si Gyeongsangnam-do 641-410 / KR | ||
02 /
LEE, Hyo-Jae 155-2 Jungang-dong Changwon-si Gyeongsangnam-do 641-030 / KR | |||
03 /
PARK, Bok-Ann 503-1702 Gimhaejangyu7cha Prugio Apt. Sammun-ri Jangyu-myeon Gimhae-si Gyeongsangnam-do 621-831 / KR | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2017/24] |
Former [2013/20] | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/26] | TER MEER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09822219.3 | 22.10.2009 | [2011/26] | WO2009KR06118 | Priority number, date | KR20080103483 | 22.10.2008 Original published format: KR 20080103483 | [2011/26] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010047543 | Date: | 29.04.2010 | Language: | KO | [2010/17] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2339178 | Date: | 29.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2339178 | Date: | 14.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 03.02.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F04B39/00, F04B39/12 | [2016/04] | CPC: |
F04B39/0061 (EP,US);
F04B53/00 (KR);
F04B39/00 (KR);
F04B39/12 (KR);
F04B39/123 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/26] | F04B39/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/24] |
Former [2011/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SAUGDÜSE FÜR EINEN HERMETISCHEN VERDICHTER | [2011/26] | English: | SUCTION MUFFLER FOR HERMETIC COMPRESSOR | [2011/26] | French: | SILENCIEUX D'ASPIRATION POUR COMPRESSEUR HERMÉTIQUE | [2011/26] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2011 | Translation filed | 31.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2011 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/26] | 20.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.01.2017 | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.10.2009 | AT | 14.06.2017 | CY | 14.06.2017 | CZ | 14.06.2017 | DK | 14.06.2017 | EE | 14.06.2017 | ES | 14.06.2017 | FI | 14.06.2017 | HR | 14.06.2017 | LT | 14.06.2017 | LV | 14.06.2017 | MC | 14.06.2017 | MK | 14.06.2017 | NL | 14.06.2017 | PL | 14.06.2017 | PT | 14.06.2017 | RO | 14.06.2017 | SE | 14.06.2017 | SI | 14.06.2017 | SK | 14.06.2017 | SM | 14.06.2017 | TR | 14.06.2017 | BG | 14.09.2017 | NO | 14.09.2017 | GR | 15.09.2017 | IS | 14.10.2017 | GB | 22.10.2017 | IE | 22.10.2017 | LU | 22.10.2017 | MT | 22.10.2017 | BE | 31.10.2017 | CH | 31.10.2017 | FR | 31.10.2017 | LI | 31.10.2017 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 22.10.2009 | |
AT | 14.06.2017 | ||
CY | 14.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
MK | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
TR | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
GB | 22.10.2017 | ||
IE | 22.10.2017 | ||
LU | 22.10.2017 | ||
MT | 22.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 22.10.2009 | |
AT | 14.06.2017 | ||
CY | 14.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
MK | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
GB | 22.10.2017 | ||
IE | 22.10.2017 | ||
LU | 22.10.2017 | ||
MT | 22.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 22.10.2009 | |
AT | 14.06.2017 | ||
CY | 14.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
GB | 22.10.2017 | ||
IE | 22.10.2017 | ||
LU | 22.10.2017 | ||
MT | 22.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 22.10.2009 | |
AT | 14.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
GB | 22.10.2017 | ||
IE | 22.10.2017 | ||
LU | 22.10.2017 | ||
MT | 22.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
GB | 22.10.2017 | ||
IE | 22.10.2017 | ||
LU | 22.10.2017 | ||
MT | 22.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
GB | 22.10.2017 | ||
LU | 22.10.2017 | ||
MT | 22.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
GB | 22.10.2017 | ||
LU | 22.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/36] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
GB | 22.10.2017 | ||
LU | 22.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
GB | 22.10.2017 | ||
LU | 22.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 14.06.2017 | |
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | ES | 14.06.2017 | |
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | ES | 14.06.2017 | |
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | ES | 14.06.2017 | |
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]EP0195486 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [X] 1,3 * figures 2, 8, 9 * * column 3, line 16 - line 39 * * column 4, line 8 - column 5, line 2 * [Y] 2 [I] 5,12; | [A]US4793775 (PERUZZI FEDERIGO [IT]) [A] 1-13 * figures 2-6 * * column 3, line 31 - line 64 * * column 4, line 45 - column 5, line 22 *; | [A]US5201640 (HEINZELMANN GILBERTO [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * figures 4-7 * * column 3, line 58 - column 4, line 61 *; | [A]US6017197 (JENSEN MICHAEL SKOVGAARD [DK], et al) [A] 1-13 * figure 1 ** column 3, line 42 - line 64 *; | [A]WO2008028265 (WHIRLPOOL SA [BR], et al) [A] 1-13 * figures 1-3 * * page 2, line 1 - line 37 * * page 6, line 29 - page 7, line 35 *; | [Y]US2008219863 (JUNG MIN KYU [KR]) [Y] 2 * figures 1, 2, 4 * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0030] * | International search | [A]JPS6022083 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO, et al); | [A]WO03038280 (BRASIL COMPRESSORES SA [BR], et al); | [A]US2008219863 (JUNG MIN KYU [KR]) |