EP2356621 - SYSTEM AND METHODS FOR DELIVERING TARGETED MARKETING OFFERS TO CONSUMERS VIA AN ONLINE PORTAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.11.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 28.12.2016 [2016/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cardlytics, Inc. 621 North Avenue NE Suite C-30 Atlanta, GA 30308 / US | [2011/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRIMES, Scott 820 Dekalb Avenue Unit 21 Atlanta, GA 30307 / US | [2011/33] | Representative(s) | Hewett, Jonathan Michael Richard, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2013/15] |
Former [2011/33] | Bruce, Alexander Richard Henry, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 09822352.2 | 17.06.2009 | [2011/33] | WO2009US47652 | Priority number, date | US20080108332P | 24.10.2008 Original published format: US 108332 P | [2011/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010047854 | Date: | 29.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/17] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2356621 | Date: | 17.08.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.01.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/00 | [2011/33] | CPC: |
G06Q30/0261 (EP,US);
G06Q30/02 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0207 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0213 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0253 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0254 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/33] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM ABLIEFERN VON GEZIELTEN MARKETING-ANGEBOTEN AN VERBRAUCHER ÜBER EIN ONLINE-PORTAL | [2011/33] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHODS FOR DELIVERING TARGETED MARKETING OFFERS TO CONSUMERS VIA AN ONLINE PORTAL | [2011/33] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE POUR PRESENTER DES OFFRES DE COMMERCIALISATION CIBLEES AUX CONSOMMATEURS VIA UN PORTAIL EN LIGNE | [2011/33] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2011 | Search fee paid | 24.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/33] | 23.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/52] | 14.06.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 21.10.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/52] | Appeal following examination | 24.08.2016 | Appeal received No. T2396/16 | 21.10.2016 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.09.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [L] - "STATEMENT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE NOTICE FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT OFFICE DATED 1 OCTOBER 2007 CONCERNING BUSINESS METHODS - EPC / ERKLAERUNG GEMAESS DER MITTEILUNG DES EUROPAEISCHEN PATENTAMTS VOM 1.OKTOBER 2007 UEBER GESCHAEFTSMETHODEN - EPU / DECLARATION CONFORMEMENT AU COMMUNIQUE DE L'OFFICE EUROP", 20071101, (20071101), XP007905525 [L] 1-15 * Statement in accordance with the Notice from the European Patent Office dated 1 October 2007 concerning business methods(OJ 11/2007; p592-593) The claimed subject matter, with due regard to the description and drawings, relates to processes comprised in the list of subject matter and activities excluded from patentability under Art.52(2) and (3) EPC. The applicant is advised that in accordance with the established practice of the EPO, no search need be performed in respect of those aspects of the claimed invention. The only identifiable technical aspects of the claimed invention relate to the use of conventional, general-purpose data processing technology for processing data of an inherently non-technical nature. The information technology employed is considered to have been generally known as it was widely available to everyone at the date of filing/priority of the present application. The notoriety of such prior art cannot reasonably be contested. No documentary evidence was therefore considered required. * | International search | [X]US2008091535 (HEISER, II ET AL.); | [Y]US2003040959 (FEI ET AL.); | [A]US2008221986 (SOICHER ET AL.); | [A]US7386485 (MUSSMAN ET AL.) | Examination | US2002078147 | US2004111491 |