EP2356483 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR AUTOMATIC DETERMINATION OF THE PHYSICAL LOCATION OF DATA CENTER EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.11.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.04.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sunbird Software, Inc. 200 Cottontail Lane, Suite B106E Somerset, New Jersey 08873 / US | [2018/16] |
Former [2011/33] | For all designated states Raritan Americas, Inc. 400 Cottontail Lane Somerset, NJ 08873 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOMASUNDARAM, Siva 356 Ridge Road Apt E-11 Dayton NJ 08810 / US | 02 /
MALIK, Naim 404 Coventry Lane Somerset NJ 08873 / US | 03 /
WANG, Brian 3F, No. 11, Aly.4 Ln.29 Sammin Rd. Xindian Dist. New Tapei City 231 / TW | [2012/18] |
Former [2011/33] | 01 /
SOMASUNDARAM, Siva 356 Ridge Road Apt E-11 Dayton NJ 08810 / US | ||
02 /
MALIK, Naim 404 Coventry Lane Somerset NJ 08873 / US | |||
03 /
WANG, Brian Xindian City / TW | Representative(s) | Page White Farrer Bedford House 21a John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/18] | Williams, David John Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | ||
Former [2011/33] | Williams, David John Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 09822579.0 | 20.10.2009 | [2011/33] | WO2009US61354 | Priority number, date | US20080106900P | 20.10.2008 Original published format: US 106900 P | [2011/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010048205 | Date: | 29.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2356483 | Date: | 17.08.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2356483 | Date: | 03.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.04.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01S5/22 | [2022/15] | CPC: |
G01S5/22 (EP,US);
H05K7/1498 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/33] | G01S15/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/18] |
Former [2011/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR AUTOMATISCHEN BESTIMMUNG DES PHYSISCHEN ORTS VON DATENZENTRALENGERÄTEN | [2011/33] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR AUTOMATIC DETERMINATION OF THE PHYSICAL LOCATION OF DATA CENTER EQUIPMENT | [2011/33] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'IDENTIFICATION AUTOMATIQUE DE L'EMPLACEMENT PHYSIQUE D'UN ÉQUIPEMENT DANS UN CENTRE INFORMATIQUE | [2022/21] |
Former [2011/33] | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D IDENTIFICATION AUTOMATIQUE DE L EMPLACEMENT PHYSIQUE D'UN ÉQUIPEMENT DANS UN CENTRE INFORMATIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2011 | Search fee paid | 19.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/33] | 02.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.03.2022 | 08.03.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 28.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 30.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.10.2018 | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2013 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   30.04.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.05.2023 | CZ | 03.05.2023 | DK | 03.05.2023 | EE | 03.05.2023 | ES | 03.05.2023 | FI | 03.05.2023 | HR | 03.05.2023 | IT | 03.05.2023 | LT | 03.05.2023 | LV | 03.05.2023 | MC | 03.05.2023 | NL | 03.05.2023 | PL | 03.05.2023 | RO | 03.05.2023 | SE | 03.05.2023 | SI | 03.05.2023 | SK | 03.05.2023 | SM | 03.05.2023 | NO | 03.08.2023 | GR | 04.08.2023 | IS | 03.09.2023 | PT | 04.09.2023 | LU | 20.10.2023 | BE | 31.10.2023 | CH | 31.10.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
CZ | 03.05.2023 | ||
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
IT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
MC | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SI | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
LU | 20.10.2023 | ||
CH | 31.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/30] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
CZ | 03.05.2023 | ||
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
IT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
MC | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SI | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
LU | 20.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
CZ | 03.05.2023 | ||
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
IT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
MC | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SI | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
CZ | 03.05.2023 | ||
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
IT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SI | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
CZ | 03.05.2023 | ||
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SI | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
CZ | 03.05.2023 | ||
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 03.05.2023 | |
PT | 04.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP1022583 (AT & T LAB CAMBRIDGE LTD [GB]) [I] 1-15 * figures 1-4 * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0043] *; | [A]FR2806473 (PDP PERSONAL DIGITAL PEN [FR]) [A] 1-15 * figures 6,7 * * page 13, paragraph 5 - page 14, paragraph 23 *; | [I]US6553013 (JONES ALAN HENRY [GB], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2006171538 (LARSON THANE M [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 2 * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0036] *; | [A]US2008247566 (MAO YEN-CHIEH [TW], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document * | International search | [Y]US4543649 (HEAD KENNETH O [US], et al); | [Y]US5515853 (SMITH WAYNE L [US], et al); | [Y]US6229899 (NORRIS ELWOOD G [US], et al); | [Y]US6553336 (JOHNSON ROBERT N [US], et al); | [Y]US7295556 (ROESE JOHN J [US], et al) | Examination | US2004178269 | by applicant | EP1022583 | FR2806473 | US2006171538 | US2008247566 |