EP2340037 - METHODS FOR DETERMINING THE LEVELS OF TGF- IN A COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.07.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.08.2014 [2014/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mead Johnson Nutrition Company 2400 West Lloyd Expressway Evansville, IN 47721-0001 / US | [2011/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAI, Gyan P. 9105 Halston Circle Newburgh, Indiana 47630 / US | 02 /
ROSALES, Francisco J. 357B Holland Road Singapore 278632 / SG | 03 /
JOUNI, Zeina E. 1035 Johannes Court Evansville, Indiana 47725 / US | 04 /
WAWORUNTU, Rosaline 5731 Quakerbridge Drive Evansville, Indiana 47711 / US | [2011/27] | Representative(s) | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2011/27] | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus VEREENIGDE Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 09822757.2 | 23.10.2009 | [2011/27] | WO2009US61790 | Priority number, date | US20080108315P | 24.10.2008 Original published format: US 108315 P | US20090370469 | 12.02.2009 Original published format: US 370469 | [2011/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010048479 | Date: | 29.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2340037 | Date: | 06.07.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.04.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/00, // G01N33/74 | [2012/19] | CPC: |
G01N33/74 (EP,US);
G01N2333/495 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/27] | A61K39/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/27] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR SCHÄTZUNG DES TGF-BETA-PEGELS IN EINER ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2011/27] | English: | METHODS FOR DETERMINING THE LEVELS OF TGF- IN A COMPOSITION | [2011/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION DES NIVEAUX DE TGF-BÊTA DANS UNE COMPOSITION | [2011/27] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2011 | Search fee paid | 07.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/27] | 02.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/32] | 31.03.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.10.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2013 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0125276 (CAMPINA MELKUNIE BV [NL], et al) [X] 15 * abstract * * page 8 - page 9 *; | [X]US2005250698 (MAUBOIS JEAN-LOUIS [FR], et al) [X] 15 * abstract * * paragraph [0130] *; | [X] - IRMELI A PENTTILA ET AL, "Transforming Growth Factor-[beta] Levels in Maternal Milk and Expression in Postnatal Rat Duodenum and Ileum", PEDIATRIC RESEARCH, (19981001), vol. 44, no. 4, doi:10.1203/00006450-199810000-00010, ISSN 0031-3998, pages 524 - 531, XP055023199 [X] 15 * chapter "Quantitative determination of TGF-beta concentration in milk" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1203/00006450-199810000-00010 | [XI] - PURUP STIG ET AL, "Biological activity of bovine milk on proliferation of human intestinal cells.", THE JOURNAL OF DAIRY RESEARCH FEB 2007 LNKD- PUBMED:16978432, (200702), vol. 74, no. 1, ISSN 0022-0299, pages 58 - 65, XP008150297 [X] 1,2,10-12,15 * chapter " milk samples " chapter "IGF-I, IGF-binding proteins and TGF-beta1 and TGF-beta2 concentrations in whey samples " * [I] 13,14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1017/50022029906002093 | [X] - OGAWA JIRO ET AL, "Role of transforming growth factor-beta in breast milk for initiation of IgAproduction in newborn infants", EARLY HUMAN DEVELOPMENT, SHANNON, IR, (20040401), vol. 77, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/J.EARLHUMDEV.2004.01.005, ISSN 0378-3782, pages 67 - 75, XP009073266 [X] 15 * chapters 2.2 and 2.3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.earlhumdev.2004.01.005 | [X] - R&d Systems, "Quantikine Human TGF-beta 1 Immunoassay", (20040426), URL: http://www.rndsystems.com/pdf/DB100.pdf, (20120328), XP055023177 [X] 15 * chapter "Reagents" * | International search | [Y]US6177550 (MEYER HANS [CH], et al); | [Y]US2004219225 (KIVITS MARINUS GERARDUS CORNEL [NL], et al); | [Y] - "Quantikine Human TGF-B1 Immunoassay. Datasheet", R&D SYSTEMS, (200805), page 2, URL: http://www.rndsystems.com/pdf/DB100B.pdf, (20091202), XP055023177 | [Y] - SAITO ET AL, "Transforming Growth Factor-Beta (TGF-B) in Human Milk", CLINICAL AND EXPERIMENTAL IMMUNOLOGY, vol. 94, no. 1, (199310), pages 220 - 224, URL: http://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pmc/articles/PMC1534356/, (20091202), XP000612958 | [Y] - "Quantikine Human TGF-B2 Immunoassay. Datasheet", R&D SYSTEMS, (200806), URL: http://www.rndsystems.com/pdf/db250.pdf, (20091202), XP008156855 |