EP2352243 - WIRELESS COMMUNICATION TERMINAL APPARATUS, WIRELESS COMMUNICATION BASE STATION APPARATUS, AND MODULATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Corporation of America 20000 Mariner Avenue, Suite 200 Torrance, CA 90503 / US | [2018/32] |
Former [2014/30] | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Corporation of America 20000 Mariner Avenue Suite 200 Torrance CA 90503 / US | ||
Former [2011/31] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIO, Akihiko c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
NAKAO, Seigo c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
IMAMURA, Daichi c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
HOSHINO, Masayuki c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2018/32] |
Former [2011/31] | 01 /
NISHIO, Akihiko c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | ||
02 /
NAKAO, Seigo c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
03 /
IMAMURA, Daichi c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
04 /
HOSHINO, Masayuki c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2018/32] |
Former [2011/31] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09823346.3 | 30.10.2009 | [2011/31] | WO2009JP05790 | Priority number, date | JP20080281391 | 31.10.2008 Original published format: JP 2008281391 | [2011/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010050233 | Date: | 06.05.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2352243 | Date: | 03.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2352243 | Date: | 08.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.05.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04, H04L5/00, H04L1/18 | [2017/13] | CPC: |
H04L1/0046 (EP,US);
H04J11/00 (US);
H04J13/0059 (US);
H04L1/1861 (EP,US);
H04L5/0007 (EP,US);
H04L5/001 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/31] | H04J11/00, H04B1/707, H04J1/00, H04W28/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/32] |
Former [2011/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENDGERÄT FÜR DRAHTLOSE KOMMUNIKATION, BASISSTATIONSVORRICHTUNG FÜR DRAHTLOSE KOMMUNIKATION SOWIE MODULATIONSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2011/31] | English: | WIRELESS COMMUNICATION TERMINAL APPARATUS, WIRELESS COMMUNICATION BASE STATION APPARATUS, AND MODULATION METHOD | [2011/31] | French: | APPAREIL DE TERMINAL DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL, APPAREIL DE STATION DE BASE DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE MODULATION | [2011/31] | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2011 | Translation filed | 29.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2011 | Search fee paid | 29.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.08.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 29.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/31] | 31.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.03.2018 | Opposition(s) | 09.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.10.2009 | AT | 08.08.2018 | CY | 08.08.2018 | CZ | 08.08.2018 | DK | 08.08.2018 | EE | 08.08.2018 | ES | 08.08.2018 | FI | 08.08.2018 | HR | 08.08.2018 | IT | 08.08.2018 | LT | 08.08.2018 | LV | 08.08.2018 | MC | 08.08.2018 | MK | 08.08.2018 | NL | 08.08.2018 | PL | 08.08.2018 | PT | 08.08.2018 | RO | 08.08.2018 | SE | 08.08.2018 | SI | 08.08.2018 | SK | 08.08.2018 | SM | 08.08.2018 | TR | 08.08.2018 | IE | 30.10.2018 | LU | 30.10.2018 | MT | 30.10.2018 | BE | 31.10.2018 | CH | 31.10.2018 | FR | 31.10.2018 | LI | 31.10.2018 | BG | 08.11.2018 | GB | 08.11.2018 | NO | 08.11.2018 | GR | 09.11.2018 | IS | 08.12.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 30.10.2009 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PT | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
TR | 08.08.2018 | ||
IE | 30.10.2018 | ||
LU | 30.10.2018 | ||
MT | 30.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GB | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PT | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
TR | 08.08.2018 | ||
IE | 30.10.2018 | ||
LU | 30.10.2018 | ||
MT | 30.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GB | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
TR | 08.08.2018 | ||
IE | 30.10.2018 | ||
LU | 30.10.2018 | ||
MT | 30.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GB | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
IE | 30.10.2018 | ||
LU | 30.10.2018 | ||
MT | 30.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GB | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
IE | 30.10.2018 | ||
LU | 30.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GB | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
IE | 30.10.2018 | ||
LU | 30.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
LU | 30.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
LU | 30.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
LU | 30.10.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
LU | 30.10.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/28] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | FI | 08.08.2018 | |
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 08.08.2018 | |
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 08.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [AP] - SAMSUNG, "UL ACK/NAK Transmission in LTE-A", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 #56BIS R1-091238, (20090323), pages 1 - 3, XP050338852 | [AP] - PANASONIC, "UL ACK/NACK transmission on PUCCH for carrier aggregation", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG1 Meeting #57bis R1-092535,, (20090629), pages 1 - 4, XP050351040 | [A] - PANASONIC, "Support of UL/DL asymmetric carrier aggregation", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #54 R1-082999,, (20080818), pages 1 - 3, XP050316462 | [AP] - PANASONIC, "PUCCH resource allocation schemes for carrier aggregation", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #58bis R1-093943, (20091012), pages 1 - 2, XP050388443 | [AP] - PANASONIC, "PDCCH design for carrier aggregation", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG1 Meeting #57 R1-091743, 2009. 05.04, (20090504), pages 1 - 9, XP050339269 | [AP] - HUAWEI, "PUCCH design for carrier aggregation", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #56bis R1-091275, 2009.03.23, (20090323), pages 1 - 8, XP050338883 | [AP] - HUAWEI, "PUCCH design for carrier aggregation", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #58bis R1-093838,, (20091012), pages 1 - 6, XP050388345 | [A] - HUAWEI, "DL/UL Asymmetric Carrier aggregation", 3GPP TSG-RAN-WG1 Meeting #54bis R1-083706, (20080929), pages 1 - 4, XP050317048 | [AP] - ZTE, "ACK/NACK Design for LTE-Advanced", TSG-RAN WG1 #58BIS R1-093821, (20091012), pages 1 - 9, XP050388332 | by applicant | JP2008281391 |