EP2340620 - METHOD OF CONTROLLING INTERFERENCE IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM HAVING MULTIPLE ANTENNAS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.04.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.05.2015 [2015/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/27] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Wook Bong LG Institute 533 Hogye 1(il)-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Su Nam LG Institute 533 Hogye 1(il)-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Jae Wan LG Institute 533 Hogye 1(il)-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR | 04 /
LIM, Dong Guk LG Institute 533 Hogye 1(il)-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR | 05 /
IHM, Bin Chul LG Institute 533 Hogye 1(il)-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR | 06 /
LEE, Moon Il LG Institute 533 Hogye 1(il)-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR | [2011/27] | Representative(s) | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/27] | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09823769.6 | 14.10.2009 | [2011/27] | WO2009KR05903 | Priority number, date | US20080109511P | 30.10.2008 Original published format: US 109511 P | US20080110601P | 02.11.2008 Original published format: US 110601 P | US20090151161P | 09.02.2009 Original published format: US 151161 P | KR20090029430 | 06.04.2009 Original published format: KR 20090029430 | [2011/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010050689 | Date: | 06.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2340620 | Date: | 06.07.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 24.06.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/04, H04B7/06 | [2014/20] | CPC: |
H04B7/0417 (EP,US);
H04B1/14 (KR);
H04B7/02 (KR);
H04B7/024 (EP,US);
H04B7/0665 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/27] | H04B7/04, H04B7/005, H04B15/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/27] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KONTROLLE VON STÖRUNGEN IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM MIT MEHREREN ANTENNEN | [2011/27] | English: | METHOD OF CONTROLLING INTERFERENCE IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM HAVING MULTIPLE ANTENNAS | [2011/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'INTERFÉRENCE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL DOTÉ D'ANTENNES MULTIPLES | [2011/27] | Entry into regional phase | 18.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 18.04.2011 | Search fee paid | 18.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/27] | 11.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/19] | 16.12.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO2008021062 (INTERDIGITAL TECH CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,11 * abstract * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0029] * [A] 2-10,13-15; | [XA]WO2008085096 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [X] 1-6,10-12 * abstract * * page 3, line 1 - page 6, line 11 * * page 7, line 21 - page 8, line 27 * * page 9, line 10 - line 20 * * page 10, line 17 - page 11, line 25 * * claim 1 * [A] 7-9,13-15; | [XPA]WO2008147121 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [XP] 1,4-6,9-12,15 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph 3 - page 4, paragraph 2 * * page 10, paragraph 3 - page 13, paragraph 7 * * claim 1 * [A] 2,3,7,8,13,14; | [XPA]US2009080549 (KHAN FAROOQ [US], et al) [XP] 1,11 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 10 - paragraph 19 * * page 4, paragraph 55 - page 5, paragraph 67 * * claim 1 *[A] 2-10,12-15 | International search | [A]KR20060038812 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [A]KR20070079788 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR], et al); | [X]US2007265037 (PAN KYLE J [US], et al); | [A]KR20080040543 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) |