Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2011203830 | Global Dossier | 25.08.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US200913125847 | 29.10.2009 | WO2009US62503 | 29.10.2009 | US11003708 | 31.10.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101289238B | Global Dossier | 26.07.2013 | B1 | KR20110081859 | 14.07.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009US62503 | 29.10.2009 | US11003708 | 31.10.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2012507832 | Global Dossier | 29.03.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009US62503 | 29.10.2009 | US11003708 | 31.10.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2342276 | Global Dossier | 25.06.2014 | A4 | EP2342276 | 13.07.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009US62503 | 29.10.2009 | US11003708 | 31.10.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102197077B | 05.03.2014 | B | CN102197077 | 21.09.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009US62503 | 29.10.2009 | US11003708 | 31.10.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010051350 | Global Dossier | 06.05.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US11003708 | 31.10.2008 |