EP2342276 - FOAM ELECTRIC WIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.05.2015 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daikin America, Inc. 20 Olympic Drive Orangeburg, NY 10962 / US | [2011/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KONO, Hideki Daikin Industries Ltd. Yodogawa Plant 1-1 Nishihitotsuya Settu-shi Osaka 566-8585 / JP | 02 /
TOCCHETTO, Rogerio 5855 Grand Ave. Plainfield IN 46168 / US | 03 /
YAMAMOTO, Yoshihisa Daikin Industries Ltd. Yodogawa Plant 1-1 Nishihitotsuya Settu-shi Osaka 566-8585 / JP | 04 /
HENDERSHOT, Ronald Daikin America Inc. Technical Center 2749 Highway 20 (35601) P.O. Box 2252 Decatur, AL 35609 / US | [2011/28] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/28] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09824118.5 | 29.10.2009 | [2011/28] | WO2009US62503 | Priority number, date | US20080110037P | 31.10.2008 Original published format: US 110037 P | [2011/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010051350 | Date: | 06.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2342276 | Date: | 13.07.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.05.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C08K3/38, H01B11/00 | [2014/26] | CPC: |
H01B3/445 (EP,US);
H01B3/30 (KR);
C08L27/12 (KR);
H01B11/18 (KR);
H01B7/0233 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/28] | C08K3/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/28] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHER SCHAUMSTOFFDRAHT | [2011/28] | English: | FOAM ELECTRIC WIRE | [2011/28] | French: | FIL ÉLECTRIQUE DU TYPE MOUSSE | [2011/28] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2011 | Search fee paid | 02.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/28] | 23.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/24] | 28.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2014 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5210377 (KENNEDY FRANCIS A [US], et al) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [A]WO9524044 (GORE & ASS [US]) [A] 1-12 * example 6; claim - *; | [A]US2008047732 (PARK CHAN-YONG [KR], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US4107354 (WILKENLOH FREDERIC NASH, et al); | [Y]US5571462 (HASHIMOTO DAI [JP], et al); | [A]US2004198886 (SHIOTSUKI KEIZOU [JP], et al); | [A]US2007149671 (SHIOTSUKI KEIZOU [JP], et al) |