08.02.2019 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 13.03.2019 [2019/11] |
06.12.2018 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
06.11.2018 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
08.06.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
31.10.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.10.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.06.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
03.11.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.10.2015 |
Change - applicant |
published on 04.11.2015 [2015/45] |
24.03.2015 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
13.01.2015 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.10.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.09.2014 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
07.05.2014 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
07.05.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.01.2014 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
24.01.2014 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
24.01.2014 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
17.01.2014 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
30.11.2013 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
04.11.2013 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
30.07.2013 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.03.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.03.2013 |
First examination report |
|
30.10.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.03.2012 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 25.04.2012 [2012/17] |
23.03.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 25.04.2012 [2012/17] |
23.03.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 25.04.2012 [2012/17] |
06.01.2012 |
Change - extension states |
published on 08.02.2012 [2012/06] |
28.10.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.07.2011 |
Change - inventor |
published on 10.08.2011 [2011/32] |
01.07.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.07.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 03.08.2011 [2011/31] |
01.07.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 03.08.2011 [2011/31] |
10.06.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.06.2011 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
21.05.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.05.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|