EP2349443 - RUPTURE-RESISTANT COMPLIANT RADIOPAQUE CATHETER BALLOON AND METHODS FOR USE OF SAME IN AN INTRAVASCULAR SURGICAL PROCEDURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.02.2019 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.03.2019 [2019/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VECTOR CORP., INC. 160 Lloyd Road Montclair NJ 07042 / US | [2015/45] |
Former [2011/31] | For all designated states R4 Vascular, Inc. 7550 Meridian Circle North Suite 150 Maple Grove, MN 55369 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALLEX, Steven, J. 5599 Saint Albans Circle Shoreview MN 55126-4796 / US | 02 /
GEER, Donald 3645 Black Oaks Lane North Plymouth MN 55446 / US | 03 /
WILLIAMS, Brett Allyn 6600 Tele Lane Lino Lake, Minnesota 55038 / US | 04 /
HATCHER, Brady Jon 23581 Juniper Court Rogers, Minnesota 55374 / US | 05 /
TIESO, Tristan Lynn 1340 Creek Park Lane Fridley, Minnesota 55432 / US | [2011/32] |
Former [2011/31] | 01 /
ALLEX, Steven, J. 5599 Saint Albans Circle Shoreview MN 55126-4796 / US | ||
02 /
GEER, Donald 3645 Black Oaks Lane North Plymouth MN 55446 / US | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/31] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09824190.4 | 30.10.2009 | [2011/31] | WO2009US62842 | Priority number, date | US20080109840P | 30.10.2008 Original published format: US 109840 P | [2011/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010051488 | Date: | 06.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2349443 | Date: | 03.08.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.05.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61M31/00, A61M29/02 | [2012/17] | CPC: |
A61M25/104 (EP,US);
A61M2025/1075 (EP,US);
A61M2025/1079 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/31] | A61M31/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/31] | Title | German: | REISSFESTER NACHGIEBIGER RÖNTGENDICHTER KATHETERBALLON UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER VERWENDUNG BEI EINEM INTRAVASKULÄREN CHIRURGISCHEN VERFAHREN | [2011/31] | English: | RUPTURE-RESISTANT COMPLIANT RADIOPAQUE CATHETER BALLOON AND METHODS FOR USE OF SAME IN AN INTRAVASCULAR SURGICAL PROCEDURE | [2011/31] | French: | BALLONNET DE CATHÉTER RADIO-OPAQUE SOUPLE RÉSISTANT À LA RUPTURE ET PROCÉDÉS POUR L'UTILISER DANS UNE INTERVENTION CHIRURGICALE INTRAVASCULAIRE | [2011/31] | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2011 | Search fee paid | 27.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/31] | 27.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/11] | 07.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/11] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.03.2013 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 14.01.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 14.01.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.01.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2013 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   30.04.2014 | 31.10.2018 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5891114 (CHIEN THOMAS YUNG-HUI [US], et al) [A] 10* column 11, line 55 - column 12, line 12; figures 4-5 *; | [A]US6503353 (PETERSON ALEX A [US], et al) [A] 6 * column 9, line 53 - line 57; figure 14 *; | [A]US6652568 (BECKER JON A [US], et al) [A] 2,7 * column 4, line 26 - line 37; figure 5 *; | [A]US2006085024 (PEPPER LANNY R [US], et al) [A] 2 * paragraphs [0003] , [0093] - [0095]; figure 16 *; | [X]US2007093865 (BECKHAM JAMES P [US]) [X] 2,3,6,7,9,10 * paragraphs [0023] - [0026]; figure 4 *; | [A]US7354428 (GOSIENGFIAO BRANDON [US], et al) [A] 9 * column 5, line 64 - column 6, line 3; figure 3A *; | [A]US2008119823 (CRANK JUSTIN M [US]) [A] 2 * paragraph [0022]; figure 3b * | International search | [Y]US3755525 (SHERIDAN D, et al); | [Y]US5759174 (FISCHELL ROBERT E [US], et al); | [Y]US5891114 (CHIEN THOMAS YUNG-HUI [US], et al); | [Y]US2002198559 (MISTRY BHAVESH [US], et al); | [Y]US6501992 (BELDEN ELISABETH L [US], et al); | [Y]US2003036728 (SAMSON WILFRED J [US], et al); | [Y]US6673025 (RICHARDSON MARK T [US], et al); | [Y]US2007093865 (BECKHAM JAMES P [US]); | [Y]US2007100280 (VAN SLOTEN LEONARD A [NL], et al) |