EP2342995 - MECHANISED BED FOR AUTOMATICALLY STRAIGHTENING BEDCLOTHES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zubeldia Jauregui, Ascensio B°Larrea, 22-1°Dcha. 20150 Villabona Guipúzcoa / ES | [2011/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2011/28] | Representative(s) | Urizar Anasagasti, Jesus Maria IPAMARK, S.L. C/ Segre 27- 1° 28002 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2013/29] | Urizar Anasagasti, Jesus Maria IPAMARK, S.L. Paseo de la Castellana 72 1° 28046 Madrid / ES | ||
Former [2011/28] | Urizar Anasagasti, Jesus Maria IPAMARK, S.L. Paseo de la Castellana 72 1° 28046 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 09824441.1 | 11.02.2009 | [2011/28] | WO2009ES00078 | Priority number, date | ES20080003177 | 06.11.2008 Original published format: ES 200803177 | [2011/28] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010052347 | Date: | 14.05.2010 | Language: | ES | [2010/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2342995 | Date: | 13.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2342995 | Date: | 17.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 14.05.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A47C21/02 | [2011/28] | CPC: |
A47C21/028 (EP,ES,US);
A47C21/02 (KR);
A47C27/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MECHANISIERTES BETT ZUR AUTOMATISCHEN BEGRADIGUNG DER BETTWÄSCHE | [2011/28] | English: | MECHANISED BED FOR AUTOMATICALLY STRAIGHTENING BEDCLOTHES | [2011/28] | French: | LIT MÉCANISÉ PERMETTANT L'ÉTIRAGE AUTOMATIQUE DE LA LITERIE | [2011/28] | Entry into regional phase | 08.04.2011 | Translation filed | 07.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.2011 | Search fee paid | 07.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/28] | 01.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 29.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.01.2013 | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.02.2009 | BG | 17.07.2013 | CY | 17.07.2013 | CZ | 17.07.2013 | DK | 17.07.2013 | EE | 17.07.2013 | FI | 17.07.2013 | GR | 17.07.2013 | HR | 17.07.2013 | LT | 17.07.2013 | LV | 17.07.2013 | MC | 17.07.2013 | MK | 17.07.2013 | MT | 17.07.2013 | PL | 17.07.2013 | RO | 17.07.2013 | SI | 17.07.2013 | SK | 17.07.2013 | TR | 17.07.2013 | NO | 17.10.2013 | ES | 28.10.2013 | IS | 17.11.2013 | PT | 18.11.2013 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 11.02.2009 | |
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
MT | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
TR | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 11.02.2009 | |
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
MT | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2016/31] | BG | 17.07.2013 | |
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
MT | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2016/25] | BG | 17.07.2013 | |
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
MT | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
MT | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/44] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | FI | 17.07.2013 | |
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | FI | 17.07.2013 | |
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | HR | 17.07.2013 | |
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | HR | 17.07.2013 | |
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 17.07.2013 | |
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 17.10.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4305167 (BARGADOS VICENTE) | International search | [A]US3343183 (SANNES WILLIS C); | [A]US3388406 (SCRIVENER JOHN W); | [A]US4305167 (BARGADOS VICENTE); | [A]US4441222 (TASCARELLA PETER J [US]); | [A]KR20050018925 (KIM HYE JUNG); | [A]CN1686068 (YANG YUSHEN [CN]); | [A]US7191479 (CHENG XIAO-ZHOU [CN]); | Examination | WO2009109898 |