EP2351403 - PLURALITY OF MOBILE COMMUNICATION DEVICES FOR PERFORMING LOCALLY COLLABORATIVE OPERATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.06.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.07.2015 [2015/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National Semiconductor Corporation 2900 Semiconductor Drive M/S D-3-579 Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | [2011/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HALLA, Brian, L. 12360 Farr Ranch Court Saratoga CA 95070 / US | 02 /
POLACEK, Michael P.O. Box 69 Pescadero CA 94060 / US | [2011/31] | Representative(s) | Liesegang, Eva, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/31] | Liesegang, Eva, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09825260.4 | 29.10.2009 | [2011/31] | WO2009US62476 | Priority number, date | US20080260774 | 29.10.2008 Original published format: US 260774 | [2011/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010053823 | Date: | 14.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2351403 | Date: | 03.08.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 26.08.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04W24/00, H04W84/18, H04W88/02, H04M1/725, H04R3/00, H04S3/00 | [2014/29] | CPC: |
H04S3/00 (EP,US);
H04W88/021 (KR);
H04B10/116 (KR);
H04M1/72412 (EP,KR,US);
H04W4/80 (KR);
G10H2210/305 (EP,US);
G10H2240/175 (EP,US);
G10H2240/211 (EP,US);
G10H2240/311 (EP,US);
G10H2240/321 (EP,US);
H04M1/72442 (EP,US);
H04M2250/02 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/31] | H04W24/00, H04W84/18, H04W88/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/31] | Title | German: | VIELZAHL VON MOBILKOMMUNIKATIONSEINRICHTUNGEN ZUM DURCHFÜHREN VON LOKAL KOLLABORATIVEN OPERATIONEN | [2011/31] | English: | PLURALITY OF MOBILE COMMUNICATION DEVICES FOR PERFORMING LOCALLY COLLABORATIVE OPERATIONS | [2011/31] | French: | PLURALITÉ DE DISPOSITIFS DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE POUR EFFECTUER DES OPÉRATIONS LOCALEMENT COLLABORATIVES | [2011/31] | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2011 | Search fee paid | 30.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/31] | 13.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/30] | 17.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   22.11.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2007087686 (HOLM JUKKA [FI], et al) [X] 1-4,6-13,15-18 * paragraphs [0001] , [0011] - [0014] - [0018] - [0025] - [0030] , [0034] , [0035] , [0041] , [0045] - [0048] * * paragraphs [0055] - [0059] - [0064] - [0070] - [0082] - [0089] - [0109] - [0141] * * figures 1-14 * [Y] 5,14; | [XY]US2007124503 (RAMOS GONZALO A [CA], et al) [X] 1,3,8,9,11,13,15-17 * paragraphs [0003] , [0006] , [0009] , [0034] , [0052] , [0065] - [0067] - [0068] , [0082] - [0094] * * paragraphs [0103] , [0109] , [0110] , [0113] - [0115] - [0129] , [0131] - [0138] * * paragraphs [0145] , [0154] , [0171] , [0179] - [0181] - [0193] * * figures 1-28 *[Y] 5,14 | International search | [A]US2004067752 (HIMMELSTEIN RICHARD B [US]); | [X]WO2008085743 (APPLE INC [US], et al) |