EP2361318 - SEPARATION METHOD FOR CARRIER-FREE RADIOLANTHANIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.09.2017 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Curators Of The University Of Missouri 340A Christopher S Bond Life Sciences Center 1201 East Rollins Road Columbia, MO 65211-7310 / US | [2011/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CUTLER, Cathy S. 5201 S. Hwy 163 Columbia Missouri 65203 / US | 02 /
WILDER, Stacy L. 3333 West HWY 124 Harrisburg Missouri 65256 / US | 03 /
EMBREE, Mary F. 807 Hope Place Columbia Missouri 65203 / US | [2011/35] | Representative(s) | Greaves Brewster LLP Copa House Station Road Cheddar, Somerset BS27 3AH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/35] | Brewster, Andrea Ruth Greaves Brewster LLP Indigo House Cheddar Business Park Wedmore Road GB-Cheddar, Somerset BS27 3EB / GB | Application number, filing date | 09825460.0 | 06.11.2009 | WO2009US63513 | Priority number, date | US20080198729P | 06.11.2008 Original published format: US 198729 P | [2011/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010054168 | Date: | 14.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2361318 | Date: | 31.08.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.05.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C22B3/28, B01D61/02 | [2011/35] | CPC: |
C22B3/42 (EP,US);
C22B59/00 (EP,US);
G21F9/12 (EP,US);
B01D15/362 (EP,US);
Y02P10/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | TRENNVERFAHREN FÜR TRÄGERFREIE RADIOLANTHANIDE | [2011/35] | English: | SEPARATION METHOD FOR CARRIER-FREE RADIOLANTHANIDES | [2011/35] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE SÉPARATION DE RADIOLANTHANIDES SANS SUPPORTS | [2011/35] | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.2011 | Search fee paid | 17.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/35] | 28.11.2014 | Observations by third parties | 03.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.01.2016 | Observations by third parties | 21.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2016 | Observations by third parties | 12.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/40] | 19.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.04.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2016 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - ROLLIN S ET AL, "Determination of lanthanides and actinides in uranium materials by high-performance liquid chromatography with inductively coupled plasma mass spectrometric detection", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V, NL, (19960719), vol. 739, no. 1, doi:10.1016/0021-9673(96)00037-4, ISSN 0021-9673, pages 139 - 149, XP004039373 [X] 1-5,8-14 * the whole document * [I] 6,7,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0021-9673(96)00037-4 | [XI] - INES GÃ 1/4 NTHER-LEOPOLD ET AL, "Characterization of nuclear fuels by ICP mass-spectrometric techniques", ANALYTICAL AND BIOANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20071009), vol. 390, no. 2, ISSN 1618-2650, pages 503 - 510, XP019584748 [X] 1-5,9-13 * the whole document * [I] 6-8,14,15 | [XI] - RAUT N M ET AL, "Comparative evaluation of three alpha-hydroxycarboxylic acids for the separation of lanthanides by dynamically modified reversed-phase high-performance liquid chromatography", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V, NL, (20020614), vol. 959, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/S0021-9673(02)00447-8, ISSN 0021-9673, pages 163 - 172, XP004360285 [X] 1-3,9-11,14 * the whole document * [I] 4-8,12,13,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0021-9673(02)00447-8 | [XI] - SANTOYO E ET AL, "Determination of lanthanides in international geochemical reference materials by reversed-phase high-performance liquid chromatography using error propagation theory to estimate total analysis uncertainties", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V, NL, vol. 1118, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.CHROMA.2006.01.131, ISSN 0021-9673, (20060616), pages 73 - 81, (20060616), XP024967317 [X] 1-3,9-11,14 * the whole document * [I] 4-8,12,13,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.chroma.2006.01.131 | International search | [X]US5470479 (SNYDER THOMAS S [US], et al); | [Y]US2008060998 (KNAPP FURN F [US], et al) | Examination | - K. HASHIMOTO ET AL, "Production of no-carrier-added177Lu via the 176Yb(n,gamma)177Yb 177Lu process", JOURNAL OF RADIOANALYTICAL AND NUCLEAR CHEMISTRY, (2003), vol. 255, no. 3, doi:10.1023/A:1022557121351, pages 575 - 579, XP002678871 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1022557121351 | other | US5470479 | JP2010223827 | - HASHIMOTO K. ET AL, "PRODUCTION OF NO-CARRIER-ADDED 177LU VIA THE 176YB(N, GAMMA)177YB -> 177LU", JOURNAL OF RADIOANALYTICAL AND NUCLEAR CHEMISTRY, (200303), vol. 255, no. 3, pages 575 - 579, XP002180135 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.1999.0235 |