EP2364507 - A METHOD FOR MANUFACTURE AND STRUCTURE OF MULTIPLE ELECTROCHEMISTRIES AND ENERGY GATHERING COMPONENTS WITHIN A UNIFIED STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 09.05.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.04.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.03.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.11.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sakti3, Inc. 1490 Eisenhower Place Building 4 Ann Arbor, MI 48108-3283 / US | [2011/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALBANO, Fabio 311 1/2 E. Liberty Street Ann Arbor, MI 48104 / US | 02 /
WANG, Chia, Wei 6751 Fleming Creek Drive Ypsilanti, MI 48198 / US | 03 /
SASTRY, Ann, Marie 4663 Erin Court Ann Arbor, MI 48105 / US | [2011/37] | Representative(s) | Booth, Andrew Steven Dyson Technology Limited Intellectual Property Department Tetbury Hill Malmesbury Wiltshire SN16 0RP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/30] | Hobday, Duncan Stuart, et al Dyson Technology Limited Intellectual Property Department Tetbury Hill Malmesbury, Wiltshire SN16 0RP / GB | ||
Former [2011/37] | Samson & Partner Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09825485.7 | 06.11.2009 | [2021/30] | WO2009US63571 | Priority number, date | US20080112707P | 07.11.2008 Original published format: US 112707 P | [2011/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010054209 | Date: | 14.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2364507 | Date: | 14.09.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2364507 | Date: | 28.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.05.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01M16/00, H01M4/04, H01M6/40, H01M10/04, H01M12/08, H01M12/00 | [2020/49] | CPC: |
H01M4/0402 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M16/00 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M10/0562 (KR,US);
H01G11/04 (EP,CN,US);
H01G11/34 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M10/0436 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M10/4264 (KR,US);
H01M10/465 (KR,US);
H01M12/08 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M16/003 (KR,US);
H01M4/0419 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M4/0421 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M4/0423 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M4/0426 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M4/0428 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M4/045 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M4/382 (KR,US);
H01M4/505 (KR,US);
H01M4/5825 (KR,US);
H01M6/40 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H02S40/38 (KR,US);
H10F71/121 (KR,US);
H10F77/219 (KR,US);
H01M16/006 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M2008/1095 (KR,US);
H01M2300/0068 (KR,US);
Y02E10/547 (EP);
Y02E60/10 (EP,US);
Y02E60/13 (EP);
Y02E60/50 (EP);
Y02E70/30 (EP);
Y02P70/50 (EP);
Y10T29/49108 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49115 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/14] | H01M16/00, H01M4/04, H01M6/40, H01M10/04 | ||
Former IPC [2011/37] | H01L25/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND STRUKTUR MEHRERER ELEKTROCHEMIEN UND ENERGIESAMMELKOMPONENTEN IN EINER VEREINIGTEN STRUKTUR | [2011/37] | English: | A METHOD FOR MANUFACTURE AND STRUCTURE OF MULTIPLE ELECTROCHEMISTRIES AND ENERGY GATHERING COMPONENTS WITHIN A UNIFIED STRUCTURE | [2011/37] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ET DE STRUCTURATION DE PLUSIEURS ÉLÉMENTS ÉLECTROCHIMIQUES ET DE COMPOSANTS COLLECTEURS D ÉNERGIE AU SEIN D UNE STRUCTURE UNIFIÉE | [2011/37] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.2011 | Search fee paid | 07.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/37] | 26.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 30.04.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.06.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.10.2017 | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.11.2009 | AT | 28.07.2021 | CY | 28.07.2021 | CZ | 28.07.2021 | DK | 28.07.2021 | EE | 28.07.2021 | ES | 28.07.2021 | FI | 28.07.2021 | HR | 28.07.2021 | IT | 28.07.2021 | LT | 28.07.2021 | LV | 28.07.2021 | MC | 28.07.2021 | MK | 28.07.2021 | MT | 28.07.2021 | NL | 28.07.2021 | PL | 28.07.2021 | RO | 28.07.2021 | SE | 28.07.2021 | SI | 28.07.2021 | SK | 28.07.2021 | SM | 28.07.2021 | TR | 28.07.2021 | BG | 28.10.2021 | NO | 28.10.2021 | GR | 29.10.2021 | IE | 06.11.2021 | LU | 06.11.2021 | IS | 28.11.2021 | PT | 29.11.2021 | BE | 30.11.2021 | CH | 30.11.2021 | LI | 30.11.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 06.11.2009 | |
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CY | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
MK | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
TR | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IE | 06.11.2021 | ||
LU | 06.11.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 06.11.2009 | |
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CY | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
MK | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IE | 06.11.2021 | ||
LU | 06.11.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 06.11.2009 | |
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CY | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IE | 06.11.2021 | ||
LU | 06.11.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
CY | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IE | 06.11.2021 | ||
LU | 06.11.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IE | 06.11.2021 | ||
LU | 06.11.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/37] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
LU | 06.11.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
LU | 06.11.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
LU | 06.11.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0108492 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [A]US4740431 (LITTLE ROGER G [US]); | [A]US2006038536 (LAFOLLETTE RODNEY M [US], et al); | [XI]WO2008035258 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) | International search | [Y]US6083637 (WALZ HANS FRIEDER [DE], et al); | [Y]US2003044662 (WALSH MICHAEL M [US]); | [Y]US6664786 (KRETSCHMANN ROBERT J [US], et al); | [X]US2005073314 (BERTNESS KEVIN I [US], et al); | [Y]US2005258801 (JOHNSON TODD W [US], et al); | [Y]US2006055175 (GRINBLAT ZINOVY D [US]); | [Y]US7150931 (JAFFREY DONALD [AU]); | [Y]US2007190418 (CHIANG YET-MING [US], et al) | by applicant | WO2008035258 |