EP2360920 - BROADCAST CONTROL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.2015 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yoshida, Kenji 9-14-2302 Koishikawa 1-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112-0002 / JP | [2014/15] |
Former [2011/34] | For all designated states YOSHIDA, Kenji 9-14-2302 Koishikawa 1-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112-0002 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2011/34] | Representative(s) | Dunleavy, Kevin James, et al Mendelsohn Dunleavy, P.C. p/o De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2013/37] | Dunleavy, Kevin James, et al Mendelsohn, Drucker and Dunleavy, P.C. p/o De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2013/03] | Dunleavy, Kevin James, et al Mendelsohn, Drucker & Associates, P.C. p/o De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2011/34] | Dunleavy, Kevin James Knoble & Yoshida LLC p/o De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 09825942.7 | 16.11.2009 | [2011/34] | WO2009JP06121 | Priority number, date | JP20080292701 | 14.11.2008 Original published format: JP 2008292701 | [2011/34] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010055689 | Date: | 20.05.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2360920 | Date: | 24.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2360920 | Date: | 09.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.05.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G08C23/04 | [2013/37] | CPC: |
G08C23/04 (EP,US);
H04N7/173 (KR);
H04N21/42202 (EP,US);
H04N21/42204 (EP,US);
H04N21/4223 (EP,US);
H04N21/4334 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/34] | H04N7/173, H04Q9/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUSSTRAHLUNGSSTEUERSYSTEM | [2011/34] | English: | BROADCAST CONTROL SYSTEM | [2011/34] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE DE RADIODIFFUSION | [2011/34] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2011 | Translation filed | 14.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2011 | Search fee paid | 14.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/34] | 26.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.10.2013 | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2011 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   14.05.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.11.2009 | AT | 09.04.2014 | BE | 09.04.2014 | CY | 09.04.2014 | CZ | 09.04.2014 | DK | 09.04.2014 | EE | 09.04.2014 | ES | 09.04.2014 | FI | 09.04.2014 | HR | 09.04.2014 | IT | 09.04.2014 | LT | 09.04.2014 | LV | 09.04.2014 | MC | 09.04.2014 | MK | 09.04.2014 | MT | 09.04.2014 | NL | 09.04.2014 | PL | 09.04.2014 | RO | 09.04.2014 | SE | 09.04.2014 | SI | 09.04.2014 | SK | 09.04.2014 | SM | 09.04.2014 | TR | 09.04.2014 | BG | 09.07.2014 | NO | 09.07.2014 | GR | 10.07.2014 | IS | 09.08.2014 | PT | 11.08.2014 | IE | 16.11.2014 | LU | 16.11.2014 | CH | 30.11.2014 | LI | 30.11.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 16.11.2009 | |
AT | 09.04.2014 | ||
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CY | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
MC | 09.04.2014 | ||
MT | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SI | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
SM | 09.04.2014 | ||
TR | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
IE | 16.11.2014 | ||
LU | 16.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 16.11.2009 | |
AT | 09.04.2014 | ||
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CY | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
MC | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SI | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
SM | 09.04.2014 | ||
TR | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
IE | 16.11.2014 | ||
LU | 16.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CY | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
MC | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SI | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
SM | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
IE | 16.11.2014 | ||
LU | 16.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
MC | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SI | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
SM | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
IE | 16.11.2014 | ||
LU | 16.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
MC | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SI | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
IE | 16.11.2014 | ||
LU | 16.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
MC | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SI | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
LU | 16.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
MC | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
LU | 16.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
MC | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
LU | 16.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
LU | 16.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | ES | 09.04.2014 | |
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | FI | 09.04.2014 | |
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | LT | 09.04.2014 | |
BG | 09.07.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2008154211 (YOSHIDA KENJI) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]GB2369706 (NDS LTD [GB]) [A] 1-10 * page 5, line 2 - page 10, line 2 *; | [A]US2002030104 (MATSUI AKIRA [JP] ET AL) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0089] * | International search | [A]JP2008154211 (YOSHIDA KENJI); | [A]JP2002092543 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO) | by applicant | JP2006203381 | JP2003511761 | JP2007288756 |