EP2362839 - HYBRID HYDRAULIC DRIVE SYSTEM WITH ACCUMULATOR AS CHASSIS OF VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.10.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rosman, Allan 4004 Schuykill Drive Calabasas, California 91302 / US | [2011/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2011/36] | Representative(s) | Madgwick, Paul Roland Ruschke Madgwick Seide & Kollegen Patentanwälte Patent Attorney (UK) PartG mbB Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/36] | Madgwick, Paul Roland RUSCHKE HARTMANN MADGWICK & SEIDE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09826447.6 | 13.11.2009 | WO2009US06126 | Priority number, date | US20080313046 | 17.11.2008 Original published format: US 313046 | [2011/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010056356 | Date: | 20.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2362839 | Date: | 07.09.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.05.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.05.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B60K26/00, B60K6/12, B62D21/04, B62D21/16, F16H61/4096 | [2016/18] | CPC: |
B60K6/12 (EP,US);
B62D21/04 (EP,US);
B62D21/16 (EP,US);
F16H61/4096 (EP,US);
Y02T10/62 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/36] | B60K26/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | HYDRAULISCHES HYBRIDANTRIEBSSYSTEM MIT AKKUMULATUR ALS FAHRWERK EINES FAHRZEUGES | [2011/36] | English: | HYBRID HYDRAULIC DRIVE SYSTEM WITH ACCUMULATOR AS CHASSIS OF VEHICLE | [2011/36] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ENTRAÎNEMENT HYDRAULIQUE HYBRIDE AVEC ACCUMULATEUR COMME CHÂSSIS DE VÉHICULE | [2011/36] | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.2011 | Search fee paid | 01.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/36] | 31.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/46] | 29.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.03.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2017 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4351409 (MALIK MARVIN J) [Y] 3,8 * abstract *; | [Y]US4754603 (ROSMAN ALAN H [US]) [Y] 1-4,6,8,9,11-13 * column 2, line 9 - column 3, line 9; figure 1 *; | [A]US5370418 (PUGH NICHOLAS [US]) [A] 1-13* the whole document *; | [Y]US5495912 (GRAY JR CHARLES L [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,6,8,9,11-13 * abstract *; | [Y]EP1433648 (CNH ITALIA SPA [IT]) [Y] 1-4,6,8,9,11-13 * paragraphs [0052] - [0054]; figure 5 *; | [Y]WO2004058550 (WALKER FRANK H [US]) [Y] 1-4,6,8,9,11-13 * page 13, lines 9-28; figures 1,3 *; | [Y]US2007095587 (DUCHARME LEONARD [US]) [Y] 3,8 * paragraph [0023]; figure 1 *; | [A]US2007102913 (RAMSEY JOHN E [US]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2008012558 (ARTEMIS INTELLIGENT POWER LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US5173859 (DEERING RICHARD K [US]); | [X]US5495912 (GRAY JR CHARLES L [US], et al); | [Y]US5923096 (MANAK RICHARD T [US]); | [Y]US6746031 (CARLSTEDT ROBERT P [US]) | by applicant | EP1433648 |