EP2355712 - DEVICE FOR THE INTRAOSTEAL SEIZING OF SUTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.10.2015 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.11.2015 [2015/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pandya, Rajiv D. 5720 Riley Terrace Road Atlanta, GA 30327 / US | [2011/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2011/33] | Representative(s) | Gislon, Gabriele Marietti, Gislon e Trupiano S.r.l. Via Larga, 16 20122 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2011/33] | Gislon, Gabriele Marietti, Gislon e Trupiano S.r.l. Via Larga 16 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 09826695.0 | 12.11.2009 | [2011/33] | WO2009US64090 | Priority number, date | US20080270513 | 13.11.2008 Original published format: US 270513 | US20080270492 | 13.11.2008 Original published format: US 270492 | US20080270506 | 13.11.2008 Original published format: US 270506 | US20080270525 | 13.11.2008 Original published format: US 270525 | [2011/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010056786 | Date: | 20.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2355712 | Date: | 17.08.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.05.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 12.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/04, A61B17/068, A61B17/16, A61B17/56 | [2011/33] | CPC: |
A61B17/1714 (EP,US);
A61B17/1684 (EP,US);
A61B17/1778 (EP,US);
A61B17/04 (EP,US);
A61B17/0482 (EP,US);
A61B17/0483 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0454 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/33] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR INTRAOSSÄREN NAHTERFASSUNG | [2011/33] | English: | DEVICE FOR THE INTRAOSTEAL SEIZING OF SUTURES | [2011/33] | French: | DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE SAISIR DES SUTURES INTRA-OSSEUSES | [2011/33] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2011 | Search fee paid | 13.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 13.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/33] | 02.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/48] | 01.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2014 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2003216742 (WETZLER MERRICK [US], et al); | [A]US2004087978 (VELEZ JUAN MANUEL [US], et al); | [A]US2006241620 (CERUNDOLO DANIEL [US]); | [A]US2006265064 (RE PAUL [US], et al); | [A]US2008058929 (WHELAN JEFFERY M [US]) |