Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015013249 | Global Dossier | 26.11.2015 | A3 | WO2015013249 | 29.01.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201313947508 | 22.07.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013181463 | Global Dossier | 05.12.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213484252 | 30.05.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9285504 | Global Dossier | 15.03.2016 | B2 | US2014324351 | 30.10.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213483208 | 30.05.2012 | US61801209 | 13.11.2009 | US11435708 | 13.11.2008 | US201313947508 | 22.07.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9274251 | Global Dossier | 01.03.2016 | B2 | US2013338920 | 19.12.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213483208 | 30.05.2012 | US201313947534 | 22.07.2013 | US61801209 | 13.11.2009 | US11435708 | 13.11.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8494774 | Global Dossier | 23.07.2013 | B2 | US2012330549 | 27.12.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213483208 | 30.05.2012 | US61801209 | 13.11.2009 | US11435708 | 13.11.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9274250 | Global Dossier | 01.03.2016 | B2 | US2012303278 | 29.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US61801209 | 13.11.2009 | US11435708 | 13.11.2008 | US201213484252 | 30.05.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2356496 | Global Dossier | 27.05.2015 | A4 | EP2356496 | 17.08.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009US64373 | 13.11.2009 | US61801209 | 13.11.2009 | US11435708 | 13.11.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2753542 | 20.05.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009US64373 | 13.11.2009 | US61801209 | 13.11.2009 | US11435708 | 13.11.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010056983 | Global Dossier | 20.05.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US61801209 | 13.11.2009 | US11435708 | 13.11.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8209124 | Global Dossier | 26.06.2012 | B2 | US2010131202 | 27.05.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US61801209 | 13.11.2009 | US11435708 | 13.11.2008 |