EP2352551 - RECHARGEABLE STIMULATION LEAD, SYSTEM, AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.03.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.04.2013 [2013/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Proteus Digital Health, Inc. 2600 Bridge Parkway, Suite 101 Redwood City, CA 94065 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2012/37] | For all designated states Proteus Digital Health, Inc. 2600 Bridge Parkway, Suite 101 Redwood City CA 94065 / US | ||
Former [2011/32] | For all designated states Proteus Biomedical, Inc. 2600 Bridge Parkway, Suite 101 Redwood City, CA 94065 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZDEBLICK, Mark 300 La Mesa Drive Portola Valley California 94028 / US | [2011/32] | Representative(s) | Hylarides, Paul Jacques, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/07] | Hylarides, Paul Jacques, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK The Hague / NL | ||
Former [2011/32] | Duxbury, Stephen, et al Arnold & Siedsma Pettenkoferstrasse 37 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09826858.4 | 13.11.2009 | [2011/32] | WO2009US64440 | Priority number, date | US20080114443P | 13.11.2008 Original published format: US 114443 P | [2011/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010057026 | Date: | 20.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2352551 | Date: | 10.08.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.05.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.08.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/36, A61N1/05, A61N1/02 | [2011/32] | CPC: |
A61N1/05 (EP,US);
A61N1/025 (EP,US);
A61N1/36185 (EP,US);
A61N1/3787 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/32] | Title | German: | WIEDERAUFLADBARE STIMULATIONSLEITUNG SOWIE SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2011/32] | English: | RECHARGEABLE STIMULATION LEAD, SYSTEM, AND METHOD | [2011/32] | French: | DISPOSITIF RECHARGEABLE DE STIMULATION, SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉS | [2011/32] | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.2011 | Search fee paid | 12.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/32] | 12.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/17] | 26.11.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2012 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2006058588 (ZDEBLICK MARK J [US]) [X] 1-8,11,12,14,15 * paragraphs [0013] - [0029] - [0052] , [0055] , [0066] - [7079] - [0086] , [0094] , [0166]; figures 1-3,16a,b,17 * [Y] 9,10,13; | [Y]US2005070982 (HERUTH KENNETH T [US], et al) [Y] 9 * paragraph [0026]; figures 3,4 *; | [Y]WO2007075974 (PROTEUS BIOMEDICAL INC [US], et al) [Y] 10 * page 65, line 10 - page 73, line 4; figures 31,35 *; | [Y]US2005154419 (WHITEHURST TODD K [US], et al) [Y] 10 * paragraph [0090]; figure 2 *; | [Y]WO2007120884 (PROTEUS BIOMEDICAL INC [US], et al) [Y] 13 * page 2, line 24 - page 3, line 2 * | International search | [Y]WO2007075974 (PROTEUS BIOMEDICAL INC [US], et al); | [Y]WO2007120884 (PROTEUS BIOMEDICAL INC [US], et al); | [X]US2006058588 (ZDEBLICK MARK J [US]); | [A]US2005070982 (HERUTH KENNETH T [US], et al) |