EP2358394 - METHOD AND FORMULATION FOR REDUCING AGGREGATION OF A MACROMOLECULE UNDER PHYSIOLOGICAL CONDITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2015 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2015 [2015/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genentech, Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2011/34] | For all designated states Genentech, Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | ||
For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOBO, Brian 2956 Emerald Place Carlsbad California 92009 / US | 02 /
LO, Sabrina 1122 Tennessee Street, Apt. 1 San Francisco, California 94107 / US | 03 /
WAKANKAR, Aditya 1885 Pacific Avenue, Apt. 202 San Francisco, California 94109 / US | 04 /
WANG, Yuchang John 832 Carmel Avenue Los Altos California 94022 / US | 05 /
WONG, Rita L. 15 West Summit Drive Redwood City California 94062 / US | 06 /
GOLDBACH, Pierre 5 rue Emilio Noelting F-68100 Mulhouse / FR | 07 /
MAHLER, Hanns-Christian Freie Strasse 10 CH-4001 Basel / CH | [2011/34] | Representative(s) | Küng, Peter F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Patent Department Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2011/34] | Küng, Peter F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Patent Department Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 09826921.0 | 16.11.2009 | [2011/34] | WO2009US64613 | Priority number, date | US20080115439P | 17.11.2008 Original published format: US 115439 P | [2011/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010057109 | Date: | 20.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2358394 | Date: | 24.08.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.05.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.05.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/32, A61K39/00, A61K9/00, C07K16/28 | [2013/08] | CPC: |
A61K47/32 (EP,US);
A61K47/30 (KR);
A61K39/395 (KR);
A61K47/50 (KR);
A61K9/0019 (EP,US);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
C07K16/2887 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
A61K2039/545 (EP,US);
C07K2317/24 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/34] | A61K47/30, A61K39/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/34] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND FORMULIERUNG ZUR REDUZIERUNG DER AGGREGATION EINES MAKROMOLEKÜLS UNTER PHYSIOLOGISCHEN BEDINGUNGEN | [2011/34] | English: | METHOD AND FORMULATION FOR REDUCING AGGREGATION OF A MACROMOLECULE UNDER PHYSIOLOGICAL CONDITIONS | [2011/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET FORMULATION POUR RÉDUIRE L'AGRÉGATION D'UNE MACROMOLÉCULE DANS DES CONDITIONS PHYSIOLOGIQUES | [2011/34] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2011 | Search fee paid | 17.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/34] | 18.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/45] | 30.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.03.2014 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 15.12.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 15.12.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.01.2015 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 19.12.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 19.12.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.01.2014 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 18.12.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 18.12.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.01.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - GOMBOTZ W R ET AL, "The stabilization of a human IgM monoclonal antibody with poly(vinylpyrrolidone)", PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19940101), vol. 11, no. 5, doi:10.1023/A:1018903624373, ISSN 0724-8741, pages 624 - 632, XP002984460 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1018903624373 | [A] - DAVE A. PARKINS ET AL, "The formulation of biopharmaceutical products", PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY TODAY, (20000401), vol. 3, no. 4, doi:10.1016/S1461-5347(00)00248-0, ISSN 1461-5347, pages 129 - 137, XP055048909 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1461-5347(00)00248-0 | [I] - WOLFF L ET AL, "Protection of aluminum hydroxide during lyophilisation as an adjuvant for freeze-dried vaccines", COLLOIDS AND SURFACES. A, PHYSICACHEMICAL AND ENGINEERING ASPECTS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 330, no. 2-3, doi:10.1016/J.COLSURFA.2008.07.031, ISSN 0927-7757, (20080730), pages 116 - 126, (20080730), XP025571839 [I] 15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.colsurfa.2008.07.031 | [XPI] - WOLFF L ET AL, "Comparative stability study of lyophilised aluminium hydroxide adjuvanted vaccine formulations containing a monoclonal antibody as a model antigen and methods used for their characterisation", COLLOIDS AND SURFACES. A, PHYSICACHEMICAL AND ENGINEERING ASPECTS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 339, no. 1-3, doi:10.1016/J.COLSURFA.2009.01.019, ISSN 0927-7757, (20090501), pages 82 - 93, (20090207), XP026076572 [XP] 15 * the whole document * [I] 1-14,16 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.colsurfa.2009.01.019 | [I] - ANTONSEN K P ET AL, "Attempts to stabilize a monoclonal antibody with water soluble synthetic polymers of varying hydrophobicity.", JOURNAL OF BIOMATERIALS SCIENCE. POLYMER EDITION 1994, (1994), vol. 6, no. 1, ISSN 0920-5063, pages 55 - 65, XP009166045 [I] 1-16 * The whole document, in particular the discussion and Fig.2 * | [AP] - WORLD HEALTH ORGANIZATION, "General policies for monoclonal antibodies, imag", 20090624, (20090624), no. INN Working Document 09.251, pages 1 - 4, XP007920972 [AP] 1-20 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US2004202658 (BENYUNES MARK C [US]); | [A]US2005136049 (LEDBETTER JEFFREY A [US], et al); | [A]US2006024300 (ADAMS CAMELLIA W [US], et al); | [Y]US2006067930 (ADAMS CAMELLIA W [US], et al); | [X]US2006193918 (ROHLOFF CATHERINE M [US], et al) |