EP2361080 - DENTAL APPLIANCE CLEANSER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.11.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.12.2016 [2016/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GlaxoSmithKline LLC Corporation Service Company 2711 Centerville Road Suite 400 Wilmington DE 19808 / US | [2016/20] |
Former [2014/15] | For all designated states GlaxoSmithKline LLC Corporation Service Company 2711 Centreville Road Suite 400 Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US | ||
Former [2011/35] | For all designated states GlaxoSmithKline LLC One Franklin Plaza 200 North 16th Street Philadelphia, PA 19102 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WETTERER, Sean, M. 23 Sussex Road Murray Hill NJ 07974 / US | [2011/35] | Representative(s) | Reeves, Julie Frances GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/35] | Reeves, Julie Frances GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property (CN9.25.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | Application number, filing date | 09826940.0 | 17.11.2009 | WO2009US64661 | Priority number, date | US20080115164P | 17.11.2008 Original published format: US 115164 P | [2011/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010057140 | Date: | 20.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2361080 | Date: | 31.08.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.05.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.05.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00, A61K8/22, A61Q11/02, A61K8/43 | [2015/52] | CPC: |
A61Q11/02 (EP,US);
A61K8/22 (EP,US);
A61K8/43 (EP,US);
A61P43/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2011/35] | A61K9/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | 17.05.2011 | BA | 17.05.2011 | RS | 17.05.2011 | Title | German: | DENTALVORRICHTUNGSREINIGER | [2011/35] | English: | DENTAL APPLIANCE CLEANSER | [2011/35] | French: | NETTOYANT POUR APPAREIL DENTAIRE | [2011/35] | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.2011 | Search fee paid | 17.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/35] | 21.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/51] | 27.07.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]FR2238475 (BLENDAX WERKE SCHNEIDER CO [DE]) [X] 1,2,4 * page 1, line 1 - line 10 * * page 1, line 37 - line 39 * * examples 5,7,8,9 * [Y] 1-7; | [XY]DE2442712 (BLENDAX WERKE SCHNEIDER CO) [X] 1,2,4-6 * first paragraph; page 1 * * third paragraph; page 2 * * examples 5,6 * [Y] 1-7; | [X]EP1219284 (DETAX KARL HUBER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4 * paragraphs [0001] , [0012] * * example 1 *; | [A]EP0787482 (KUKIDENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-7 * page 1, line 19 - line 22 * | [Y] - "FDA Warns of Allergy to Denture Cleansers Chemical in Denture Cleansers May Trigger Risky Allergic reactions.", WEBMD, (20080228), URL: http://www.webmd.com/oral-health/news/20080226/fda-eyes-allergy-to-denture-cleansers, (20131216), XP055093720 [Y] 1-7 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US2003007937 (LAWLOR THOMAS MARK [GB]); | [Y]US5300290 (SPENCER JEAN L [US]); | [Y]US4078558 (WOOG PHILIPPE-GUY E, et al); | [Y]US2008050398 (BOCKMUEHL DIRK [DE], et al); | [A]US2007254260 (ALDEN WAYNE S IV [US], et al) | [Y] - WEBMD, "FDA Warns of Allergy to Denture Cleansers Chemical in Denture Cleansers May Trigger Risky Allergic Reactions.", WEBMD HEALTH NEWSREVIEWED BY LOUISE CHANG MD, (20080226), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/'/http://www.webmd.com/oral-health/news/20080226/fda-eyes-allergy-to-denture-cleansers, (20080226), XP055093720 |