EP2374793 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING ALKENYL MERCAPTAN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 31.01.2014 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.03.2014 [2014/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 27-1, Shinkawa 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8260 / JP | [2011/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUKI, Toshiaki 2-6-531 Ikku-cho Niihama-shi Ehime 792-0025 / JP | [2011/41] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/41] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09827619.9 | 20.11.2009 | WO2009JP69702 | Priority number, date | JP20080296436 | 20.11.2008 Original published format: JP 2008296436 | [2011/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010058838 | Date: | 27.05.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2374793 | Date: | 12.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07C319/02, C07C319/26, C07C321/08, C07B61/00 | [2011/41] | CPC: |
C07C319/04 (EP,US);
C07C319/24 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C319/04, C07C321/08 (EP,US);
C07C319/24, C07C321/18 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ALKENYLMERCAPTAN | [2011/41] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING ALKENYL MERCAPTAN | [2011/41] | French: | MÉTHODE DE PRODUCTION D'UN ALCÉNYLMERCAPTAN | [2011/41] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2011 | Translation filed | 09.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2011 | Search fee paid | 09.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/41] | 21.01.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2007204453 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO) | by applicant | JP2007204453 | JP2008296436 |