Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP2362730
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
24.06.2016 |
Refusal of application |
published on 27.07.2016 [2016/30] |
07.03.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
07.03.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused |
|
13.11.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.03.2015 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
13.11.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.01.2014 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
20.11.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.11.2013 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.07.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
12.07.2013 |
First examination report |
|
27.02.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
16.11.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.07.2012 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 29.08.2012 [2012/35] |
27.07.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 29.08.2012 [2012/35] |
27.07.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 29.08.2012 [2012/35] |
17.11.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.08.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 07.09.2011 [2011/36] |
05.08.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 07.09.2011 [2011/36] |
01.08.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.07.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.07.2011 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
12.07.2011 |
New entry: Fee payment for extension state |
|
11.06.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.05.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|