Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8927549 | Global Dossier | 06.01.2015 | B2 | US2011224244 | 15.09.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009US64776 | 17.11.2009 | US200913128045 | 17.11.2009 | US11681008 | 21.11.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2012509879 | Global Dossier | 26.04.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009US64776 | 17.11.2009 | US11681008 | 21.11.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2744383 | Global Dossier | 25.04.2017 | C | CA2744383 | 27.05.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009US64776 | 17.11.2009 | US11681008 | 21.11.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2009316802B | Global Dossier | 26.02.2015 | B2 | AU2009316802 | 27.05.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009US64776 | 17.11.2009 | US11681008 | 21.11.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2362730 | Global Dossier | 29.08.2012 | A4 | EP2362730 | 07.09.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009US64776 | 17.11.2009 | US11681008 | 21.11.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0921299 | 25.08.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2009US64776 | 17.11.2009 | US11681008 | 21.11.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102223797 | 19.10.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009US64776 | 17.11.2009 | US11681008 | 21.11.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA020496 | 28.11.2014 | B1 | EA201170703 | 30.01.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009US64776 | 17.11.2009 | US11681008 | 21.11.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2011005037 | 16.06.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009US64776 | 17.11.2009 | US11681008 | 21.11.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA201104551 | 28.03.2012 | B | Priority number | Date | WO2009US64776 | 17.11.2009 | US11681008 | 21.11.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010059618 | Global Dossier | 27.05.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US11681008 | 21.11.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20110088575 | Global Dossier | 03.08.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US11681008 | 21.11.2008 |