EP2362730 - ADAMANTYL BENZAMIDE COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 24.06.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 27.07.2016 [2016/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states High Point Pharmaceuticals, LLC 4170 Mendenhall Oaks Parkway High Point, NC 27265 / US | [2011/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POLISETTI, Dharma Rao 3741 Deerfield Street High Point North Carolina 27265 / US | 02 /
GUPTA, Suparna 2518 Brandt Forest Court Greensboro North Carolina 27455 / US | 03 /
EBDRUP, Soren Nymarksvej 11 DK-4000 Roskilde / DK | [2011/36] | Representative(s) | Cooke, Richard Spencer, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus London EC1N 2HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/36] | Cooke, Richard Spencer, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus London EC1N 2HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 09828106.6 | 17.11.2009 | WO2009US64776 | Priority number, date | US20080116810P | 21.11.2008 Original published format: US 116810 P | [2011/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010059618 | Date: | 27.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2362730 | Date: | 07.09.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.05.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/42, A61K31/44, A61K31/50, C07D213/64, C07D213/70, C07D213/71, C07D213/72, C07D237/14, A61P27/06 | [2012/35] | CPC: |
A61K31/44 (EP,KR,US);
C07D213/64 (KR);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/06 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07D213/643 (EP,KR,US);
C07D213/70 (EP,KR,US);
C07D213/71 (EP,KR,US);
C07D213/74 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/36] | A01N43/42, A61K31/44 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | 23.05.2011 | BA | 23.05.2011 | RS | 23.05.2011 | Title | German: | ADAMANTYL-BENZAMID-VERBINDUNGEN | [2011/36] | English: | ADAMANTYL BENZAMIDE COMPOUNDS | [2011/36] | French: | ADAMANTYLBENZAMIDES | [2011/36] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2011 | Search fee paid | 23.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/36] | 26.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/30] | 21.01.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/30] | 08.03.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.07.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2004056745 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE], et al) [Y] 1-14 * abstract * * page 29, paragraph last *; | [IY]WO2008101914 (TRANSTECH PHARMA [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * abstract * * page 71, lines 8-12 * * embodiment 203; page 108 * * page 43, lines 30-31,34-35, * * claims 1,12,13,14,16 * [Y] 1-14; | [Y] - ROHDE J J ET AL, "DISCOVERY AND METABOLIC STABILIZATION OF POTENT AND SELECTIVE 2-AMINO-N-(ADAMANT-2-YL) ACETAMINE 11BETA-HYDROXYSTEROID DEHYDROGENASE TYPE 1 INHIBITORS", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (20061213), vol. 50, no. 1, doi:10.1021/JM0609364, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 149 - 164, XP002497957 [Y] 1-14 * abstract * * page 153; tables 2,4 * * page 156, column l, paragraph last - column r, paragraph first * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm0609364 | [Y] - SORENSEN B ET AL, "Adamantane 11-beta-HSD-1 inhibitors: Application of an isocyanide multicomponent reaction", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, PERGAMON, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, GB, vol. 16, no. 23, ISSN 0960-894X, (20061201), pages 5958 - 5962, (20061201), XP027966030 [Y] 1-14 * abstract * * page 5960; table 1 * * page 5961, column l, paragraph 2 * | International search | [Y]US5786379 (BERNARDON JEAN-MICHEL [FR]); | [Y]WO2008101886 (TRANSTECH PHARMA [US], et al); | [Y]WO2008101907 (TRANSTECH PHARMA [US], et al) | by applicant | US4166452 | US4265874 | US4356108 | EP0214826 | EP0368187 | EP0481522 | US5504188 | EP0705275 | WO9726265 | EP0792290 | WO9741097 | WO9808871 | WO9901423 | WO9903861 | WO9919313 | WO0190090 | WO0190091 | WO0190092 | WO0190093 | WO0190094 | WO2004089470 | WO2004089415 | WO2004089416 | - J. PHARM. SCI., (1977), vol. 66, page 2 |