EP2365701 - DISPLAY DEVICE, TERMINAL DEVICE, AND DISPLAY METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.02.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.03.2017 [2017/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | For all designated states NLT Technologies, Ltd. 1753, Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku Kawasaki Kanagawa 211-8666 / JP | [2011/42] |
Former [2011/37] | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | ||
For all designated states NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd. 1753 Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8666 / JP | |||
Former [2011/37] | For all designated states Nec Corporation 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SATO, TETSUSI c/o NEC LCD Technologies Ltd. 1753 Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8666 / JP | 02 /
SHIGEMURA, Koji c/o NEC LCD Technologies Ltd. 1753 Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8666 / JP | 03 /
SERIZAWA, Masahiro c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2011/37] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/37] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09828938.2 | 07.10.2009 | WO2009JP67469 | Priority number, date | JP20080300965 | 26.11.2008 Original published format: JP 2008300965 | [2011/37] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010061689 | Date: | 03.06.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2365701 | Date: | 14.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04N13/04, G02B27/22 | [2011/37] | CPC: |
H04N13/315 (EP,CN,US);
G02B30/27 (CN,US);
G02B30/28 (EP);
G02B30/31 (EP);
H04N13/359 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ANZEIGEANORDNUNG, ENDGERÄT UND ANZEIGEVERFAHREN | [2011/37] | English: | DISPLAY DEVICE, TERMINAL DEVICE, AND DISPLAY METHOD | [2011/37] | French: | DISPOSITIF D AFFICHAGE, DISPOSITIF TERMINAL ET PROCÉDÉ D AFFICHAGE | [2011/37] | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2011 | Translation filed | 30.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2011 | Search fee paid | 30.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 30.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/37] | 31.01.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JP2004356997 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [Y]JP2005006114 (SHARP KK); | [Y]JP2005151080 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [X]JP2005266293 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]JP2007047294 (JAPAN BROADCASTING CORP); | [Y]JP2007318184 (SHARP KK) | by applicant | JPH09152668 | JPH1172697 | JP2000152285 | JP2001066547 | JP2008300965 | - NIKKEI ELECTRONICS, (20030106), no. 838, pages 26 - 27 |