EP2351851 - METHOD FOR MEASURING CYTOKERATIN-19 MRNA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tosoh Corporation 4560, Kaisei-cho Shunan-shi Yamaguchi 746-8501 / JP | [2011/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OMOTO, Daisuke c/o TOSOH CORPORATION Tokyo Research Center 2743-1 Hayakawa Ayase-shi Kanagawa 252-1123 / JP | 02 /
SAITO, Juichi c/o TOSOH CORPORATION Tokyo Research Center 2743-1 Hayakawa Ayase-shi Kanagawa 252-1123 / JP | 03 /
OONAKA, Satoru c/o TOSOH CORPORATION Tokyo Research Center 2743-1 Hayakawa Ayase-shi Kanagawa 252-1123 / JP | 04 /
HAYASHI, Toshinori c/o TOSOH CORPORATION Tokyo Research Center 2743-1 Hayakawa Ayase-shi Kanagawa 252-1123 / JP | [2015/28] |
Former [2011/31] | 01 /
OMOTO, Daisuke c/o TOSOH CORPORATION Tokyo Research Center 2743-1 Hayakawa Ayase-shi Kanagawa 252-1123 / JP | ||
02 /
SAITO, Juichi c/o TOSOH CORPORATION Tokyo Research Center 2743-1 Hayakawa Ayase-shi Kanagawa 252-1123 / JP | |||
03 /
OONAKA, Satoru c/o TOSOH CORPORATION Tokyo Research Center 2743-1 Hayakawa Ayase-shi Kanagawa 252-1123 / JP | |||
04 /
HAYASHI, Toshinori c/o TOSOH CORPORATION Tokyo Research Center 2743-1 Hayakawa Ayase-shi Kanagawa 252-1123 / JP | Representative(s) | Vigand, Philippe, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex - Genève / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2015/28] | Kügele, Bernhard, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | ||
Former [2011/31] | Kügele, Bernhard, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | ||
Former [2011/31] | Kügele, Bernhard, et al Novagraaf International SA 25, avenue du Pailly CH-1220 Les Avanchets-Genève / CH | Application number, filing date | 09829212.1 | 30.11.2009 | [2011/31] | WO2009JP70439 | Priority number, date | JP20080303637 | 28.11.2008 Original published format: JP 2008303637 | [2011/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010061981 | Date: | 03.06.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2351851 | Date: | 03.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2351851 | Date: | 08.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.06.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, C12N15/09 | [2011/31] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6853 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6865 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6853, C12Q2525/143, C12Q2545/114, C12Q2561/113 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6865, C12Q2531/143, C12Q2525/143, C12Q2521/107, C12Q1/6865, C12Q2545/114, C12Q2561/113 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/28] |
Former [2011/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR CYTOKERATIN-19-MRNA-MESSUNG | [2011/31] | English: | METHOD FOR MEASURING CYTOKERATIN-19 MRNA | [2011/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR MESURER L'ARNM DE CYTOKÉRATINE-19 | [2011/31] | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.2011 | Translation filed | 20.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.2011 | Search fee paid | 20.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/31] | 03.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 24.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.05.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.11.2009 | AT | 08.07.2015 | BE | 08.07.2015 | BG | 08.07.2015 | CY | 08.07.2015 | CZ | 08.07.2015 | DK | 08.07.2015 | EE | 08.07.2015 | ES | 08.07.2015 | FI | 08.07.2015 | HR | 08.07.2015 | LT | 08.07.2015 | LV | 08.07.2015 | MC | 08.07.2015 | MK | 08.07.2015 | MT | 08.07.2015 | NL | 08.07.2015 | PL | 08.07.2015 | RO | 08.07.2015 | SE | 08.07.2015 | SI | 08.07.2015 | SK | 08.07.2015 | SM | 08.07.2015 | TR | 08.07.2015 | NO | 08.10.2015 | GR | 09.10.2015 | IS | 08.11.2015 | PT | 09.11.2015 | CH | 30.11.2015 | IE | 30.11.2015 | LI | 30.11.2015 | LU | 30.11.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/38] | HU | 30.11.2009 | |
AT | 08.07.2015 | ||
BE | 08.07.2015 | ||
BG | 08.07.2015 | ||
CY | 08.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
MT | 08.07.2015 | ||
NL | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
SM | 08.07.2015 | ||
TR | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
IE | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
LU | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
BE | 08.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
IE | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
LU | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
IE | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
LU | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
LU | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
LU | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
LU | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 08.07.2015 | |
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 08.07.2015 | |
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 08.07.2015 | |
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 08.07.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1475445 (TOSOH CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP1783232 (TOSOH CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP1780289 (TOSOH CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0855447 (TOSOH CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO9617079 (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL], et al) [Y] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [X]WO0173031 (CORIXA CORP [US], et al) [X] 8,9 * sequence 29 *; | [X]US6504010 (WANG TONGTONG [US], et al) [X] 8,9 * sequence 1377 *; | [Y] - Premierbiosoft, "NASBA Technology", (19940101), URL: http://www.premierbiosoft.com/tech_notes/NASBA.html, (20110817), XP055004958 [Y] 1-9 * the whole document * | [Y] - KIEVITS T ET AL, "NASBA TM ISOTHERMAL ENZYMATIC IN VITRO NUCLEIC ACID AMPLIFICATION OPTIMIZED FOR THE DIAGNOSIS OF HIV-1 INFECTION", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGICAL METHODS, ELSEVIER BV, NL, (19911201), vol. 35, no. 3, doi:10.1016/0166-0934(91)90069-C, ISSN 0166-0934, pages 273 - 286, XP000576430 [Y] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0166-0934(91)90069-C | [Y] - ISHIGURO T ET AL, "INTERCALATION ACTIVATING FLUORESCENCE DNA PROBE AND ITS APPLICATION TO HOMOGENEOUS QUANTIFICATION OF A TARGET SEQUENCE BY ISOTHERMAL SEQUENCE AMPLIFICATION IN A CLOSED VESSEL", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, ACADEMIC PRESS INC, NEW YORK, (20030101), vol. 314, doi:10.1016/S0003-2697(02)00618-8, ISSN 0003-2697, pages 77 - 86, XP001165733 [Y] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0003-2697(02)00618-8 | [Y] - LAMBRECHTS A C ET AL, "COMPARISON OF IMMUNOCYTOCHEMISTRY, REVERSE TRANSCRIPTASE POLYMERASE CHAIN REACTION, AND NUCLEIC ACID SEQUENCE-BASED AMPLIFICATION FOR THE DETECTION OF CIRCULATING BREAST CANCER CELLS", BREAST CANCER RESEARCH AND TREATMENT, SPRINGER, NEW YORK, NY, (19990801), vol. 56, no. 3, doi:10.1023/A:1006261731125, ISSN 0167-6806, pages 219 - 231, XP009035704 [Y] 1-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1006261731125 | International search | [Y]JP2007275016 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE, et al); | [Y]JP2008194028 (SYSMEX CORP); | [Y]JP2000014400 (TOSOH CORP); | [Y]JP2003033182 (TOSOH CORP); | [Y]JP2003289869 (TOSOH CORP); | [Y]JP2001333783 (TOSOH CORP); | [Y]JP2002320481 (TOSOH CORP); | [Y]JP2008000112 (SYSMEX CORP); | [X]WO03026584 (GEN HOSPITAL CORP [US], et al); | [Y] - ISHIGURO, T. ET AL., "Intercalation activating fluorescence DNA probe and its application to homogeneous quantification of a target sequence by isothermal sequence amplification in a closed vessel.", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (2003), vol. 314, pages 77 - 86, XP001165733 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0003-2697(02)00618-8 | [YP] - OMOTO, D. ET AL., "TRC-ho ni yoru Nyugan Sentinel Lymph-setsu Ten'i no Shindan no Yuyosei", THE JAPAN SOCIETY FOR CLINICAL LABORATORY AUTOMATION DAI 41 KAI TAIKAI SHOROKUSHU, (20090901), page 578, XP008147159 | [YP] - OMOTO, D. ET AL., "Nyugan Sentinel Lymph-setsu Seiken ni Okeru TRC CK19 mRNA Sokutei no Yuyosei", DAI 56 KAI JAPANESE SOCIETY OF LABORATORY MEDICINE GAKUJUTSU SHUKAI, (20090728), page 296, XP008148249 |