EP2361055 - IMPROVED BOLUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.10.2014 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.11.2014 [2014/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer New Zealand Limited KPMG Centre Level 12 85 Alexandra Street Hamilton 3204 / NZ | [2014/33] |
Former [2011/35] | For all designated states Bomac Research Limited PO Box 76369 Manukau City Wiri Station Road Manukau, Auckland 2104 / NZ | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEECH, Wayne, Frederick 2 Rochas Place Manukau City Auckland 2023 / NZ | 02 /
POMROY, William Ernest 365 Scotts Road RD 4 Palmerston North 4474 / NZ | [2014/31] |
Former [2011/35] | 01 /
LEECH, Wayne, Frederick 2 Rochas Place Manukau City, Auckland 2023 / NZ | ||
02 /
POMROY, William Ernest 365 Scotts Road RD 4 Palmerston, North 4474 / NZ | Representative(s) | Wilson Gunn Blackfriars House The Parsonage 5th Floor Manchester M3 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/35] | Wilson Gunn 5th Floor, Blackfriars House The Parsonage Manchester Lancashire M3 2JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 09829372.3 | 21.08.2009 | WO2009NZ00173 | Priority number, date | NZ20080573143 | 25.11.2008 Original published format: NZ 57314308 | [2011/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010062191 | Date: | 03.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2361055 | Date: | 31.08.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 03.06.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/52, A61K31/429, A61K31/7048, A61P33/10 | [2013/51] | CPC: |
A61K31/429 (EP,US);
A61K31/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/7048 (EP,US);
A61K9/0068 (EP,US);
A61P33/00 (EP);
A61P33/10 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/429, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/7048, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2011/35] | A61F2/00, A61J3/00, A61J3/08, A61M31/00, A61K9/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERBESSERTER BOLUS | [2011/35] | English: | IMPROVED BOLUS | [2011/35] | French: | MODÈLE AMÉLIORÉ DE DOSE INGÉRABLE | [2011/35] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2011 | Search fee paid | 23.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.01.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 23.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/35] | 11.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0243111 (CASTEX PROD [GB]) [X] 1,8,10,11,14 * page 14, line 3 - page 15, line 20 * * figures 6, 8 * [Y] 1-15; | [Y]WO9519763 (NEW ZEALAND PASTORIAL AGRICULT [NZ]) [Y] 1-15 * page 3, lines 24-26 * * page 4, lines 15-24 ** figure 2 *; | [XY]WO02089763 (PORTER WILLIAM LESLIE [GB]) [X] 1,2,8,14,15 * page 3, paragraph 3 * * page 5, paragraph 2 * * page 6 * * page 12 * [Y] 1-15 | International search | [A]US4418686 (CHILD FRANCIS W [US]); | [Y]EP0243111 (CASTEX PROD [GB]); | [Y]WO9519763 (NEW ZEALAND PASTORIAL AGRICULT [NZ]); | [Y]EP0482947 (CASTEX PROD [GB]); | [A]GB2333452 (PORTER WILLIAM LESLIE [GB]); | [A]US6030367 (BALESTRACCI ERNEST [US]); | [A]US2005244459 (DEWITT DAVID M [US], et al) |