EP2349527 - SINGLE-PIECE TAPPED PLATE AND RETAINER FOR FLUID FILTERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.07.2014 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Purolator Filters NA LLC 3200 Natal Road Fayetteville, NC 28306 / US | [2011/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRYE, Randy, Charles 2865 Ross Road Lillington, NC 27546 / US | 02 /
MORTON, Ken 3116 Turtle Point Road Apt. B Fayetteville, NC 28304 / US | 03 /
GHADIYARAM, Sudheer 2704 Plum Ridge Road Fayetteville, NC 28306 / US | [2011/31] | Representative(s) | Jones, John Bryn, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/31] | Jones, John Bryn, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 09829629.6 | 29.10.2009 | [2011/31] | WO2009US62594 | Priority number, date | US20080263720 | 03.11.2008 Original published format: US 263720 | [2011/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010062666 | Date: | 03.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2349527 | Date: | 03.08.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 22.07.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B01D35/30, F02M37/22, B01D27/08 | [2011/31] | CPC: |
B01D27/08 (EP,US);
B01D27/005 (EP,US);
B01D2201/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/31] | Title | German: | EINSTÜCKIGE GEWINDEPLATTE UND AUFNAHME FÜR FLUIDFILTER | [2011/31] | English: | SINGLE-PIECE TAPPED PLATE AND RETAINER FOR FLUID FILTERS | [2011/31] | French: | PLAQUE TARAUDÉE ET ÉLÉMENT DE RETENUE MONOBLOC POUR FILTRES DE FLUIDE | [2011/31] | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2011 | Search fee paid | 26.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/31] | 18.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/34] | 04.04.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/34] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.10.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2013 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2002030007 (KOH SAENG GON [KR]) [X] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [X]US6345721 (DURRE REYNOLD FREDERICK [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9511072 (TAWAS IND [US]) [X] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [X]US4421444 (HANLEY WILLIAM [US]) [X] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [X]GB2100140 (GEN MOTORS LTD) [X] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [X]DE2140551 (NIPPONDENSO CO,LTD) [X] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [X]US2006137316 (KRULL TIMOTHY L [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US6349836 (LANGSDORF BRIAN J [US], et al); | [A]US6202859 (LANGSDORF BRIAN J [US], et al); | [A]US5490930 (KRULL TIMOTHY L [US]); | [A]KR20010023093 (DONALDSON COMPANY, INC.) | by applicant | US2002030007 | US6345721 |