EP2352369 - GENOME EDITING IN RATS USING ZINC-FINGER NUCLEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sangamo BioSciences, Inc. Point Richmond Tech. Center 501 Canal Boulevard, Suite A100 Richmond, CA 94804 / US | For all designated states Sigma Aldrich Company 3050 Spruce Street St. Louis, MO 63103 / US | [2017/17] |
Former [2011/32] | For all designated states Sangamo BioSciences, Inc. Point Richmond Tech. Center 501 Canal Boulevard Suite A100 Richmond, CA 94804 / US | ||
For all designated states Sigma Aldrich Company 3050 Spruce Street St. Louis, MO 63103 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CUI, Xiaoxia 1231 Craig Road St. Louis, MO 63146 / US | 02 /
GEURTS, Aron M. 13370 Sunburst Ct. New Berlin, WI 53151 / US | 03 /
URNOV, Fyodor c/o Sangamo BioSciences Inc. Point Richmond Tech Center 501 Canal Blvd. Suite A100 Richmond, CA 94804 / US | [2017/22] |
Former [2017/17] | 01 /
CUI, Xiaoxia 1231 Craig Road St. Louis, MO 63146 / US | ||
02 /
GEURTS, Aron M. 12540 W. Wilbur Dr. New Berlin, WI 53151 / US | |||
03 /
URNOV, Fyodor c/o Sangamo BioSciences Inc. Point Richmond Tech Center 501 Canal Blvd. Suite A100 Richmond, CA 94804 / US | |||
Former [2011/32] | 01 /
CUI, Xiaoxia 1231 Craig Road St. Louis Missouri 63146 / US | ||
02 /
GEURTS, Aron M. 12540 W. Wilbur Dr. New Berlin Wisconsin 53151 / US | |||
03 /
URNOV, Fyodor c/o Sangamo BioSciences Inc. Point Richmond Tech Center 501 Canal Blvd. Suite A100 Richmond, California 94804 / US | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [2017/17] |
Former [2011/32] | Heubeck, Christian, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Postfach 860820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09830727.5 | 03.12.2009 | [2011/32] | WO2009US06365 | Priority number, date | US20080200985P | 04.12.2008 Original published format: US 200985 P | US20090205970P | 26.01.2009 Original published format: US 205970 P | US20090263904P | 24.11.2009 Original published format: US 263904 P | [2011/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010065123 | Date: | 10.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2352369 | Date: | 10.08.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2352369 | Date: | 26.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.06.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A01K67/027, C12N15/11, C12N9/22, C12N15/85 | [2012/18] | CPC: |
A01K67/0275 (EP,US);
C12N5/16 (KR);
C12N15/907 (US);
A01K67/0276 (EP,US);
A01K67/0278 (EP,KR,US);
C12N15/1024 (US);
C12N15/11 (KR);
C12N15/8509 (EP,KR,US);
C12N9/22 (EP,KR,US);
A01K2217/054 (EP,US);
A01K2217/15 (EP,KR,US);
A01K2227/10 (EP,US);
A01K2227/105 (EP,KR,US);
A01K2267/03 (EP,US);
A01K2267/0393 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/81 (EP,KR,US);
C12N2015/8527 (US);
|
Former IPC [2011/32] | A01K67/027, C12N15/11 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/17] |
Former [2011/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GENOMÄNDERUNG BEI RATTEN MITHILFE VON ZINK-FINGER-NUKLEASEN | [2017/16] | English: | GENOME EDITING IN RATS USING ZINC-FINGER NUCLEASES | [2011/32] | French: | ÉDITION DE GÉNOME CHEZ DES RATS AU MOYEN DE NUCLÉASES EN DOIGT DE ZINC | [2011/32] |
Former [2011/32] | GEMONÄNDERUNG BEI RATTEN MITHILFE VON ZINK-FINGER-NUKLEASEN | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2011 | Search fee paid | 31.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/32] | 04.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.05.2015 | 24.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 12.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16200237.2 / EP3156494 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.12.2009 | AT | 26.04.2017 | CY | 26.04.2017 | CZ | 26.04.2017 | DK | 26.04.2017 | EE | 26.04.2017 | FI | 26.04.2017 | HR | 26.04.2017 | LT | 26.04.2017 | LV | 26.04.2017 | MC | 26.04.2017 | MK | 26.04.2017 | PL | 26.04.2017 | PT | 26.04.2017 | RO | 26.04.2017 | SE | 26.04.2017 | SI | 26.04.2017 | SK | 26.04.2017 | SM | 26.04.2017 | TR | 26.04.2017 | BG | 26.07.2017 | NO | 26.07.2017 | GR | 27.07.2017 | IS | 26.08.2017 | IE | 03.12.2017 | LU | 03.12.2017 | MT | 03.12.2017 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 03.12.2009 | |
AT | 26.04.2017 | ||
CY | 26.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
MK | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
TR | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
IE | 03.12.2017 | ||
LU | 03.12.2017 | ||
MT | 03.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 03.12.2009 | |
AT | 26.04.2017 | ||
CY | 26.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
MK | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
IE | 03.12.2017 | ||
LU | 03.12.2017 | ||
MT | 03.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 03.12.2009 | |
AT | 26.04.2017 | ||
CY | 26.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
IE | 03.12.2017 | ||
LU | 03.12.2017 | ||
MT | 03.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 03.12.2009 | |
AT | 26.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
IE | 03.12.2017 | ||
LU | 03.12.2017 | ||
MT | 03.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
IE | 03.12.2017 | ||
LU | 03.12.2017 | ||
MT | 03.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
IE | 03.12.2017 | ||
LU | 03.12.2017 | ||
MT | 03.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
LU | 03.12.2017 | ||
MT | 03.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO03087341 (UNIV UTAH RES FOUND [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * page 2 - page 10; claims 1-89 *; | [I] - PORTEUS M H ET AL, "GENE TARGETING USING ZINC FINGER NUCLEASES", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20050801), vol. 23, no. 8, doi:10.1038/NBT1125, ISSN 1087-0156, pages 967 - 973, XP002467422 [I] 1-12 * figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt1125 | [I] - MILLER JEFFREY C ET AL, "An improved zinc-finger nuclease architecture for highly specific genome editing", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20070701), vol. 25, no. 7, doi:10.1038/NBT1319, ISSN 1087-0156, pages 778 - 785, XP002465119 [I] 1-12 * figures 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt1319 | [I] - URNOV F D ET AL, "Highly efficient endogenous human gene correction using designed zinc-finger nucleases", NATURE: INTERNATIONAL WEEKLY JOURNAL OF SCIENCE, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, UNITED KINGDOM, (20050602), vol. 435, no. 7042, doi:10.1038/NATURE03556, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 646 - 651, XP002411069 [I] 1-12 * figures 1-6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature03556 | International search | [X]US2005208489 (CARROLL DANA [US], et al); | [Y] - PORTEUS, "Mammalian gene targeting with designed zinc finger nucleases", MOL THERAP, (200602), vol. 13, no. 2, pages 438 - 446, XP005252904 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ymthe.2005.08.003 | Examination | EP1348335 | WO03080809 | WO2008151081 | US2009205083 | - DOYON Y ET AL, "Heritable targeted gene disruption in zebrafish using designed zinc-finger nucleases", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 26, no. 6, doi:10.1038/NBT1409, ISSN 1087-0156, (20080601), pages 702 - 708, (20080525), XP002512110 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/NBT1409 | - MENG XIANGDONG ET AL, "Targeted gene inactivation in zebrafish using engineered zinc-finger nucleases", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 26, no. 6, doi:10.1038/NBT1398, ISSN 1087-0156, (20080601), pages 695 - 701, (20080525), XP002512111 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/NBT1398 | - HAAS M J ET AL, "Characterization of rare p53 mutants from carcinogen-treated albumin-simian virus 40 T-antigen transgenic rats.", MOLECULAR CARCINOGENESIS FEB 1998, (199802), vol. 21, no. 2, ISSN 0899-1987, pages 128 - 134 | - GÓMEZ-ANGELATS M ET AL, "Mutational analysis of three tumor suppressor genes in two models of rat hepatocarcinogenesis.", MOLECULAR CARCINOGENESIS JUL 1999, (199907), vol. 25, no. 3, ISSN 0899-1987, pages 157 - 163 | - HAMMERSCHMIDT M ET AL, "Strategies to perturb zebrafish development", METHODS IN CELL BIOLOGY, ACADEM. PRESS, US, (19990101), vol. 59, ISSN 0091-679X, pages 87 - 115, XP008092469 | by applicant | US4186183 | US4217344 | US4235871 | US4261975 | US4485054 | US4501728 | US4774085 | US4837028 | US4897355 | US4946787 | US5049386 | WO9116024 | WO9117424 | US5176996 | US5356802 | US5420032 | US5422251 | WO9519431 | US5436150 | US5487994 | WO9606166 | US5585245 | US5789538 | WO9837186 | WO9844350 | WO9853058 | WO9853059 | WO9853060 | WO9853057 | WO9854311 | US5925523 | GB2338237 | US6007988 | US6008336 | US6013453 | WO0027878 | US6140081 | US6140466 | US6200759 | US6242568 | WO0160970 | WO0188197 | WO0216536 | US6410248 | US6453242 | WO02077227 | US6479626 | WO02099084 | US6503717 | WO03016496 | US6534261 | US6599692 | US6607882 | EP1348335 | WO03080809 | US2003232410 | US6689558 | US6824978 | US6833252 | US2005026157 | US2005064474 | US6903185 | US6933113 | US2005208489 | US6979539 | US7013219 | US2006063231 | US2006188987 | US7153949 | US7163824 | WO2007014275 | US2007134796 | US2007218528 | US2008015164 | US2008015996 | US2008131962 | US2008159996 | WO2008133938 | WO2008151081 | US2009205083 | - MICHALKIEWICZ ET AL., J. AMER. PHYS. SOCIETY, (2007), vol. 293, pages H881 - H894 | - DOYON ET AL., NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (2008), vol. 26, no. 6, pages 702 - 708 | - MENG ET AL., NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (2008), vol. 26, no. 6, pages 695 - 701 | - HAAS ET AL., MOLECULAR CARCINOGENESIS, (1998), vol. 21, no. 2, pages 128 - 134 | - METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, SAN DIEGO, ACADEMIC PRESS | - "Chromatin", METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1999), vol. 304 | - "Chromatin Protocols", METHODS IN MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, HUMANA PRESS, (1999), vol. 119 | - SMITH; WATERMAN, ADVANCES IN APPLIED MATHEMATICS, (1981), vol. 2, pages 482 - 489 | - DAYHOFF, Atlas of Protein Sequences and Structure, NATIONAL BIOMEDICAL RESEARCH FOUNDATION, vol. 3, pages 353 - 358 | - GRIBSKOV, NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1986), vol. 14, no. 6, pages 6745 - 6763 | - FIELDS ET AL., NATURE, (1989), vol. 340, pages 245 - 246 | - BEERLI ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOL., (2002), vol. 20, pages 135 - 141 | - PABO ET AL., ANN. REV. BIOCHEM., (2001), vol. 70, pages 313 - 340 | - ISALAN ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOL., (2001), vol. 19, pages 656 - 660 | - SEGAL ET AL., CURR. OPIN. BIOTECHNOL., (2001), vol. 12, pages 632 - 637 | - CHOO ET AL., CURR. OPIN. STRUCT. BIOL., (2000), vol. 10, pages 411 - 416 | - BELFORT ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1997), vol. 25, pages 3379 - 3388 | - LI ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 89, pages 4275 - 4279 | - LI ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 2764 - 2768 | - KIM ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1994), vol. 91, pages 883 - 887 | - KIM ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1994), vol. 269, pages 31,978 - 31,982 | - BITINAITE ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1998), vol. 95, pages 10,570 - 10,575 | - ROBERTS ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (2003), vol. 31, pages 418 - 420 | - DUJON ET AL., GENE, (1989), vol. 82, pages 115 - 118 | - PERLER ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1994), vol. 22, pages 1125 - 1127 | - JASIN, TRENDS GENET., (1996), vol. 12, pages 224 - 228 | - GIMBLE ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1996), vol. 263, pages 163 - 180 | - ARGAST ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1998), vol. 280, pages 345 - 353 | - CHEVALIER ET AL., MOLEC. CELL, (2002), vol. 10, pages 895 - 905 | - EPINAT ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (2003), vol. 31, pages 2952 - 2962 | - ASHWORTH ET AL., NATURE, (2006), vol. 441, pages 656 - 659 | - PAQUES ET AL., CURRENT GENE THERAPY, (2007), vol. 7, pages 49 - 66 | - HAMMERSCHMIDT ET AL., METHODS CELL BIOL., (1999), vol. 59, pages 87 - 115 | - CRYSTAL, SCIENCE, (1995), vol. 270, pages 404 - 410 | - BLAESE ET AL., CANCER GENE THER., (1995), vol. 2, pages 291 - 297 | - BEHR ET AL., BIOCONJUGATE CHEM., (1994), vol. 5, pages 382 - 389 | - REMY ET AL., BIOCONJUGATE CHEM., (1994), vol. 5, pages 647 - 654 | - GAO ET AL., GENE THERAPY, (1995), vol. 2, pages 710 - 722 | - AHMAD ET AL., CANCER RES., (1992), vol. 52, pages 4817 - 4820 | - UMOV ET AL., NATURE, (2005), vol. 435, no. 7042, pages 646 - 651 | - URNOV ET AL., NATURE, (2005), vol. 435, no. 7042, pages 646 - 651 | - DOYON ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2008), vol. 26, no. 6, pages 702 - 708 | - FILIPIAK ET AL., TRANSGENIC RES, (2006), vol. 15, pages 673 - 686 | - LLOYD ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2005), vol. 102, pages 2232 - 2237 | - SCIENCE, (2009), vol. 325, page 433 | US20080284887 |