EP2367761 - MOLECULAR SIEVE SSZ-83 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chevron U.S.A. Inc. 6001 Bollinger Canyon Road San Ramon, CA 94583 / US | [2016/23] |
Former [2011/39] | For all designated states Chevron U.S.A., Inc. 6001 Bollinger Canyon Road San Ramon, CA 94583 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURTON, Allen W. Jr. 91 Bayside Court Richmond California 94804 / US | 02 /
ZONES, Stacey I. 1874 9th Avenue San Francisco California 94122 / US | [2011/39] | Representative(s) | Nash, David Allan Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [2016/23] |
Former [2011/39] | Nash, David Allan Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 09830860.4 | 19.11.2009 | [2016/23] | WO2009US65068 | Priority number, date | US20080277896 | 25.11.2008 Original published format: US 277896 | US20080277916 | 25.11.2008 Original published format: US 277916 | [2011/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010065318 | Date: | 10.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2367761 | Date: | 28.09.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2367761 | Date: | 08.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 16.09.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C01B39/48, C01B39/12, C01B37/02, C01B37/00 | [2015/36] | CPC: |
C01B37/02 (EP);
C01B37/005 (EP);
C01B37/007 (EP);
C01B39/12 (EP);
C01B39/48 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2011/39] | C01B39/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MOLEKULARSIEB SSZ-83 | [2011/39] | English: | MOLECULAR SIEVE SSZ-83 | [2011/39] | French: | TAMIS MOLÉCULAIRE SSZ-83 | [2011/39] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2011 | Search fee paid | 20.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/39] | 25.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.04.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.03.2016 | Opposition(s) | 09.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.11.2009 | AT | 08.06.2016 | BE | 08.06.2016 | BG | 08.06.2016 | CY | 08.06.2016 | CZ | 08.06.2016 | DK | 08.06.2016 | EE | 08.06.2016 | ES | 08.06.2016 | FI | 08.06.2016 | HR | 08.06.2016 | LT | 08.06.2016 | LV | 08.06.2016 | MC | 08.06.2016 | MK | 08.06.2016 | PL | 08.06.2016 | RO | 08.06.2016 | SI | 08.06.2016 | SK | 08.06.2016 | SM | 08.06.2016 | TR | 08.06.2016 | NO | 08.09.2016 | GR | 09.09.2016 | IS | 08.10.2016 | PT | 10.10.2016 | IE | 19.11.2016 | MT | 19.11.2016 | CH | 30.11.2016 | LI | 30.11.2016 | LU | 30.11.2016 | [2018/43] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 19.11.2009 | |
AT | 08.06.2016 | ||
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
BG | 08.06.2016 | ||
CY | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
ES | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
MK | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
TR | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
IE | 19.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 19.11.2009 | |
AT | 08.06.2016 | ||
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
CY | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
ES | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
MK | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
TR | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
IE | 19.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 19.11.2009 | |
AT | 08.06.2016 | ||
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
CY | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
ES | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
MK | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
IE | 19.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 08.06.2016 | |
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
ES | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
IE | 19.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/43] | AT | 08.06.2016 | |
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
ES | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 08.06.2016 | |
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
ES | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 08.06.2016 | |
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
ES | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 08.06.2016 | |
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
ES | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 08.06.2016 | |
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
ES | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | ES | 08.06.2016 | |
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | ES | 08.06.2016 | |
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 08.06.2016 | |
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 08.06.2016 | |
NO | 08.09.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4941963 (VALYOCSIK ERNEST W [US]) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-9 * * column 4, line 3 - line 50 * * column 8, line 49 - column 9, line 17 * * table 2 *; | [A]US2007148086 (ZONES STACEY I [US], et al) [A] 1-15* examples 1-6 *; | [A]WO2007146622 (CHEVRON USA INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 13, line 16 - line 30 * * claims 5-7 * | International search | [A]US4963337 (ZONES STACEY I [US]); | [A]US5007997 (ZONES STACY I [US], et al); | [A]US6086848 (NAKAGAWA YUMI [US], et al); | [A]US7022308 (YUEN LUN-TEH [US], et al) |