EP2357259 - HIGH-PURITY FERRITIC STAINLESS STEEL HAVING EXCELLENT CORROSION RESISTANCE, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.12.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Steel & Sumikin Stainless Steel Corporation 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | [2011/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HATANO, Masaharu c/o Nippon Steel&Sumikin Stainless SteelCorporation 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | 02 /
TAKAHASHI, Akihiko c/o Nippon Steel&Sumikin Stainless Steel Corporation 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | 03 /
ISHIMARU, Eiichiro c/o Nippon Steel&Sumikin Stainless Steel Corporation 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | 04 /
TAKAHATA, Shigenori c/o Nippon Steel&Sumikin Stainless Steel Corporation 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | [2015/07] |
Former [2011/33] | 01 /
HATANO, Masaharu c/o Nippon Steel&Sumikin Stainless SteelCorporation 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | ||
02 /
TAKAHASHI, Akihiko c/o Nippon Steel&Sumikin Stainless Steel Corporation 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | |||
03 /
ISHIMARU, Eiichiro c/o Nippon Steel&Sumikin Stainless Steel Corporation 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | |||
04 /
TAKAHATA, Shigenori c/o Nippon Steel&Sumikin Stainless Steel Corporation 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/07] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/33] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09831981.7 | 07.12.2009 | [2011/33] | WO2009JP70788 | Priority number, date | JP20080313700 | 09.12.2008 Original published format: JP 2008313700 | JP20090276786 | 04.12.2009 Original published format: JP 2009276786 | [2011/33] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010067878 | Date: | 17.06.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2357259 | Date: | 17.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2357259 | Date: | 11.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.06.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/00, C21D9/46, C22C38/18, C22C38/54 | [2011/33] | CPC: |
C22C38/02 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/18 (EP,KR,US);
C21D1/76 (EP,KR,US);
C21D6/002 (EP,KR,US);
C21D8/0205 (EP,KR,US);
C21D9/46 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/001 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/008 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/04 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/33] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOCHREINER FERRITISCHER EDELSTAHL MIT HERVORRAGENDER KORROSIONSBESTÄNDIGKEIT UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2011/33] | English: | HIGH-PURITY FERRITIC STAINLESS STEEL HAVING EXCELLENT CORROSION RESISTANCE, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | [2011/33] | French: | ACIER FERRITIQUE INOXYDABLE DE HAUTE PURETÉ PRÉSENTANT UNE EXCELLENTE RÉSISTANCE À LA CORROSION, ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE CELUI-CI | [2015/03] |
Former [2011/33] | ACIER FERRITIQUE INOXYDABLE DE GRANDE PURETÉ PRÉSENTANT UNE EXCELLENTE RÉSISTANCE À LA CORROSION, ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE CELUI-CI | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.2011 | Translation filed | 08.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.2011 | Search fee paid | 08.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/33] | 14.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.11.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 12.11.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.12.2009 | AT | 11.02.2015 | BE | 11.02.2015 | BG | 11.02.2015 | CY | 11.02.2015 | CZ | 11.02.2015 | DK | 11.02.2015 | EE | 11.02.2015 | HR | 11.02.2015 | LT | 11.02.2015 | LV | 11.02.2015 | MC | 11.02.2015 | MK | 11.02.2015 | MT | 11.02.2015 | NL | 11.02.2015 | PL | 11.02.2015 | PT | 11.02.2015 | RO | 11.02.2015 | SI | 11.02.2015 | SK | 11.02.2015 | SM | 11.02.2015 | TR | 11.02.2015 | NO | 11.05.2015 | GR | 12.05.2015 | IS | 11.06.2015 | [2018/34] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 07.12.2009 | |
AT | 11.02.2015 | ||
BE | 11.02.2015 | ||
BG | 11.02.2015 | ||
CY | 11.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.02.2015 | ||
DK | 11.02.2015 | ||
EE | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
MC | 11.02.2015 | ||
MK | 11.02.2015 | ||
MT | 11.02.2015 | ||
NL | 11.02.2015 | ||
PL | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
SI | 11.02.2015 | ||
SK | 11.02.2015 | ||
SM | 11.02.2015 | ||
TR | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 07.12.2009 | |
AT | 11.02.2015 | ||
BE | 11.02.2015 | ||
BG | 11.02.2015 | ||
CY | 11.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.02.2015 | ||
DK | 11.02.2015 | ||
EE | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
MC | 11.02.2015 | ||
MT | 11.02.2015 | ||
NL | 11.02.2015 | ||
PL | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
SI | 11.02.2015 | ||
SK | 11.02.2015 | ||
SM | 11.02.2015 | ||
TR | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 11.02.2015 | |
BE | 11.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.02.2015 | ||
DK | 11.02.2015 | ||
EE | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
MC | 11.02.2015 | ||
NL | 11.02.2015 | ||
PL | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
SI | 11.02.2015 | ||
SK | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 11.02.2015 | |
BE | 11.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.02.2015 | ||
DK | 11.02.2015 | ||
EE | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
NL | 11.02.2015 | ||
PL | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
SI | 11.02.2015 | ||
SK | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 11.02.2015 | |
CZ | 11.02.2015 | ||
DK | 11.02.2015 | ||
EE | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
NL | 11.02.2015 | ||
PL | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
SI | 11.02.2015 | ||
SK | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 11.02.2015 | |
CZ | 11.02.2015 | ||
DK | 11.02.2015 | ||
EE | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
NL | 11.02.2015 | ||
PL | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
SK | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 11.02.2015 | |
CZ | 11.02.2015 | ||
DK | 11.02.2015 | ||
EE | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
NL | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
SK | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 11.02.2015 | |
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
NL | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 11.02.2015 | |
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
IS | 11.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | HR | 11.02.2015 | |
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | HR | 11.02.2015 | |
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
NO | 11.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 11.02.2015 | |
NO | 11.05.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2008190003 (NIPPON STEEL & SUMIKIN SST) [A] 1-5 * table 1 *; | [A]JP2005220429 (NIPPON STEEL & SUMIKIN SST) [A] 1-5 * table 1 *; | [A]EP1571227 (NIPPON STEEL & SUMIKIN SST [JP]) [A] 1-5 * table 1 *; | [A]US6423159 (LIESERT SILKE [FR], et al) [A] 1-5 * table 1 *; | [A]JP2001355048 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] 1-5 * tables 1-3 * | International search | [A]JP2000169943 (NIPPON STEEL CORP); | [A]JPH1192872 (NIPPON STEEL CORP); | [A]JPH1112704 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO) | by applicant | JP2008001945 | JPH06172935 | JPH0734205 | JP2000169943 | JP2001262234 | JP2001288543 | JP2001288544 | WO2007129703 |