EP2370026 - LOCKABLE EXPANDING SPINE CAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Howmedica Osteonics Corp. 325 Corporate Drive Mahwah, NJ 07430 / US | [2015/29] |
Former [2011/40] | For all designated states Coalign Innovations, Inc. 150 No. Hill Drive, Suite 1 Brisbane, CA 94005 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KADABA, Murali 1711 Edgewood Road Emerald Hills CA 94062 / US | 02 /
SIMPSON, Philip, J. 3185 Pioneer Place Escondido CA 92025 / US | 03 /
ASHLEY, John, E. 668 Park Hill Road Danville CA 94526 / US | 04 /
GILLESPIE, Walter, Dean 385 Walnut Avenue Unit G Carlsbad CA 92008 / US | 05 /
GROTZ, Thomas 165 Wild Horse Valley Road Novato CA 94947 / US | 06 /
MANSFIELD, George, A., III 3060 Dalen Place San Diego CA 92122 / US | 07 /
MATSUURA, David, G. 859 Summersong Court Encinitas CA 92024 / US | 08 /
PRETTI, Rudy 12090 Peregrine Way Auburn CA 95603 / US | [2011/40] | Representative(s) | Shanks, Andrew, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | [2015/32] |
Former [2011/40] | Shanks, Andrew, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | Application number, filing date | 09832515.2 | 10.12.2009 | WO2009US67446 | Priority number, date | US20090380840 | 04.03.2009 Original published format: US 380840 | US20080201518P | 10.12.2008 Original published format: US 201518 P | US20090548260 | 26.08.2009 Original published format: US 548260 | [2011/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010068725 | Date: | 17.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2370026 | Date: | 05.10.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2370026 | Date: | 05.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 14.10.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/44, A61B17/70 | [2011/40] | CPC: |
A61F2/442 (EP,US);
A61F2/44 (US);
A61F2/4455 (EP,US);
A61F2/482 (EP,US);
A61F2/484 (EP,US);
A61F2/30742 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30079 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3008 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30133 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30365 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30405 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30476 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30484 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30495 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30505 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30514 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30522 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30525 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3055 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30579 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30581 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30589 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30601 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30841 (EP,US);
A61F2210/009 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0025 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0033 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0015 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0007 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0069 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERRIEGELBARER DEHNBARER CAGE | [2011/40] | English: | LOCKABLE EXPANDING SPINE CAGE | [2011/40] | French: | CAGE SPINALE À DILATATION VERROUILLABLE | [2011/40] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2011 | Search fee paid | 27.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/40] | 25.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP15179587.9 / EP3009106 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.02.2015 | Opposition(s) | 09.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.12.2009 | AT | 05.08.2015 | BE | 05.08.2015 | BG | 05.08.2015 | CY | 05.08.2015 | CZ | 05.08.2015 | DK | 05.08.2015 | EE | 05.08.2015 | ES | 05.08.2015 | FI | 05.08.2015 | HR | 05.08.2015 | IT | 05.08.2015 | LT | 05.08.2015 | LV | 05.08.2015 | MC | 05.08.2015 | MK | 05.08.2015 | MT | 05.08.2015 | NL | 05.08.2015 | PL | 05.08.2015 | RO | 05.08.2015 | SE | 05.08.2015 | SI | 05.08.2015 | SK | 05.08.2015 | SM | 05.08.2015 | TR | 05.08.2015 | NO | 05.11.2015 | GR | 06.11.2015 | IS | 05.12.2015 | PT | 07.12.2015 | IE | 10.12.2015 | LU | 10.12.2015 | CH | 31.12.2015 | LI | 31.12.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/38] | HU | 10.12.2009 | |
AT | 05.08.2015 | ||
BE | 05.08.2015 | ||
BG | 05.08.2015 | ||
CY | 05.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
MT | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
SM | 05.08.2015 | ||
TR | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
IE | 10.12.2015 | ||
LU | 10.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
BE | 05.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
IE | 10.12.2015 | ||
LU | 10.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
IE | 10.12.2015 | ||
LU | 10.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
IE | 10.12.2015 | ||
LU | 10.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
LU | 10.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
LU | 10.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 05.08.2015 | |
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 05.08.2015 | |
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 05.08.2015 | |
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 05.08.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO03003951 (BAAT MEDICAL ENGINEERING B V [NL], et al) [X] 1,2* page 4, line 15 - page 8, line 3; figures 1a-2b; claim - *; | [X]US2005033437 (BAO QI-BIN [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,8,14 * paragraphs [0078] - [0093]; figures 14,15,26,27,33,34; claim - *; | [XI]US2007255413 (EDIE JASON A [US], et al) [X] 1-7,14 * paragraphs [0014] - [0022]; figures 1-6; claim - * [I] 12,13,15; | [X]WO2007124078 (SPINAL KINETICS INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,7,12-14 * paragraphs [0101] - [0129]; figures 3a-6a, 18-28; claim - * | International search | [A]US2005273169 (PURCELL THOMAS [US]); | [A]US2006200244 (ASSAKER RICHARD [BE]); | [A]US2007255409 (DICKSON ANDREW M [US], et al); | [A]US2008114467 (CAPOTE MARCO D [US], et al); | [A]US2008147194 (GROTZ THOMAS [US], et al); | [A]US2008177387 (PARIMORE DIANNA [US], et al); | [A]US2008281424 (PARRY JOHN [GB], et al); | [A]US2008300598 (BARREIRO PETER [US], et al) |