EP2356051 - RIBBON TRANSPORT APPARATUS AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.11.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.12.2015 [2015/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Goss International Americas, Inc. 121 Technology Drive Durham, NH 03824 / US | [2011/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EBERT, Dieter, Theodor 137 Winnicutt Road Stratham NH 03885 / US | 02 /
JACKSON, Barry, Mark 21 Windmill Acres York ME 03909 / US | 03 /
GAGNON, David, John 33 Pleasant Street Somersworth NH 03878 / US | [2011/33] | Representative(s) | Kling, Simone Lavoix Munich Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/33] | Kling, Simone Lavoix Munich Bayerstrasse 85a 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09832558.2 | 10.12.2009 | [2011/33] | WO2009US67553 | Priority number, date | US20080316137 | 10.12.2008 Original published format: US 316137 | [2011/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010068792 | Date: | 17.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2356051 | Date: | 17.08.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.06.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B65H45/22, B65H20/06, B65H20/12 | [2012/32] | CPC: |
B65H20/06 (EP,US);
B65H20/12 (EP,US);
B65H45/22 (EP);
B65H2301/3113 (EP,US);
B65H2301/45 (US);
B65H2406/32 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/33] | B65H20/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/33] | Title | German: | BANDTRANSPORTVORRICHTUNG UND -VERFAHREN | [2011/33] | English: | RIBBON TRANSPORT APPARATUS AND METHOD | [2011/33] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSPORT DE RUBAN | [2011/33] | Entry into regional phase | 10.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.2011 | Search fee paid | 10.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/33] | 16.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/49] | 28.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2014 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE4040830 (MABEG MASCHINENBAU GMBH NACHF [DE]) [Y] 3-5 * column 3, lines 19-39 * * column 4, lines 19-28 *; | [A]WO02102697 (KOENIG & BAUER AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-18 * figures 1-5 * * the whole document *; | [XY]US6544160 (HARTMANN MANFRED WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,6-18 * abstract * * column 1, lines 28-33 * * column 5, lines 14-24 * * the whole document * [Y] 3-5; | [A]US2003089756 (DEMERS SYLVAIN [CA]) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph last - page 3, paragraph 3rd * * the whole document *; | [A]US2007184959 (BECK PETER F [DE], et al) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0005] ** paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0013] * | International search | [Y]US4336813 (SERAGNOLI ENZO); | [Y]US5685528 (WEIS ANTON [DE]); | [X]US6419217 (HARTMANN MANFRED WOLFGANG [DE], et al) |