EP2371084 - SYSTEM, DEVICE AND METHOD FOR SECURE PROVISION OF KEY CREDENTIAL INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states McAlear, James A. 272 Madhu Crescent Ottawa, Ontario K2C 4J3 / CA | [2012/08] |
Former [2011/40] | For all designated states Her Majesty the Queen in Right of Canada as represented by the Minister of National Defence 101 Colonel By Drive Ottawa, Ontario K1A 0K2 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2012/08] |
Former [2011/40] | 01 /
MCALEAR, James A. 272 Madhu Crescent Ottawa Ontario K2C 4J3 / CA | Representative(s) | Liebetanz, Michael Isler & Pedrazzini AG Giesshübelstrasse 45 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2016/13] | Liebetanz, Michael Isler & Pedrazzini AG Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2011/40] | Liebetanz, Michael Isler & Pedrazzini AG Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 09832770.3 | 14.12.2009 | [2016/13] | WO2009CA01832 | Priority number, date | CA20082650163 | 18.12.2008 Original published format: CA 2650163 | [2011/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010069056 | Date: | 24.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2371084 | Date: | 05.10.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2371084 | Date: | 30.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 24.06.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/83, G06F21/84, G06F21/85, G06F21/31 | [2015/47] | CPC: |
G06F21/84 (EP);
G06F21/109 (EP);
G06F21/31 (EP);
G06F21/83 (EP);
G06F21/85 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2011/40] | H04L9/32, G06F21/00, G06Q20/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM, VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR SICHEREN BEREITSTELLUNG VON SCHLÜSSELAUTHENTIFIZIERUNGSINFORMATIONEN | [2011/40] | English: | SYSTEM, DEVICE AND METHOD FOR SECURE PROVISION OF KEY CREDENTIAL INFORMATION | [2011/40] | French: | SYSTÈME, DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE FOURNITURE SÉCURISÉE D'INFORMATIONS DE JUSTIFICATIF D'IDENTITÉ À CLEF | [2011/40] | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.2011 | Search fee paid | 01.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/40] | 01.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.01.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.12.2009 | AT | 30.03.2016 | BE | 30.03.2016 | BG | 30.03.2016 | CY | 30.03.2016 | CZ | 30.03.2016 | DK | 30.03.2016 | EE | 30.03.2016 | ES | 30.03.2016 | FI | 30.03.2016 | HR | 30.03.2016 | IT | 30.03.2016 | LT | 30.03.2016 | LV | 30.03.2016 | MC | 30.03.2016 | MK | 30.03.2016 | NL | 30.03.2016 | PL | 30.03.2016 | RO | 30.03.2016 | SE | 30.03.2016 | SI | 30.03.2016 | SK | 30.03.2016 | SM | 30.03.2016 | TR | 30.03.2016 | NO | 30.06.2016 | GR | 01.07.2016 | IS | 30.07.2016 | PT | 01.08.2016 | IE | 14.12.2016 | LU | 14.12.2016 | MT | 14.12.2016 | CH | 31.12.2016 | LI | 31.12.2016 | [2018/43] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 14.12.2009 | |
AT | 30.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
BG | 30.03.2016 | ||
CY | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
MK | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
TR | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
IE | 14.12.2016 | ||
LU | 14.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 14.12.2009 | |
AT | 30.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CY | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
MK | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
TR | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
IE | 14.12.2016 | ||
LU | 14.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 14.12.2009 | |
AT | 30.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CY | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
MK | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
IE | 14.12.2016 | ||
LU | 14.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
IE | 14.12.2016 | ||
LU | 14.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 30.03.2016 | |
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | FI | 30.03.2016 | |
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/44] | FI | 30.03.2016 | |
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | FI | 30.03.2016 | |
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | FI | 30.03.2016 | |
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 30.03.2016 | |
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9746931 (CKD SA [FR], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 1, line 5 - page 2, line 23 * * page 5, line 9 - page 5, line 27 * * page 6, line 18 - page 7, line 25 * * figures 1, 2 *; | [A]US5822435 (BOEBERT WILLIAM E [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 1, line 8 - column 1, line 10 * * column 2, line 55 - column 2, line 63 * * column 5, line 14 - column 5, line 51 * * page 8, line 24 - page 8, line 44 ** figure 4 *; | [Y]FR2850772 (FRANCE TELECOM [FR]) [Y] 1-15 * page 2, line 11 - page 2, line 34 * * page 4, line 12 - page 4, line 18 * * page 6, line 5 - page 7, line 28 * * page 8, line 14 - page 10, line 7 * * figures 1, 4, 5 *; | [Y]WO2006089710 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 1, line 5 - page 1, line 16 * * page 4, line 7 - page 6, line 4 * * page 7, line 6 - page 7, line 11 * * page 10, line 25 - page 11, line 14 * * page 12, line 4 - page 13, line 19 * * page 18, line 12 - page 18, line 25 * | International search | [A]EP1796052 (PALO ALTO RES CT INC [US]); | [A]US2007180505 (PATEL PARUL D [US], et al); | [X]US2007241182 (BUER MARK [US]) |