Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
31.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.12.2014 [2014/49] |
16.07.2014 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
30.01.2014 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
08.11.2013 | Supplementary search report | published on 11.12.2013 [2013/50] |
08.11.2013 | Change - classification | published on 11.12.2013 [2013/50] |
08.11.2013 | Change - classification | published on 11.12.2013 [2013/50] |
09.08.2013 | Change - representative | published on 11.09.2013 [2013/37] |
14.12.2012 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
17.02.2012 | Change - extension states | published on 21.03.2012 [2012/12] |
15.12.2011 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
23.09.2011 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] |
23.09.2011 | Request for examination filed | published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] |
21.09.2011 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
30.08.2011 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
06.07.2010 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
25.06.2010 | PCT data prior to European publication |