EP2380562 - A CONTROLLED-RELEASED OSMOTIC PUMP TABLET WITH LUBRICATING LAYER AND THE PREPARATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.10.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.12.2014 [2014/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Kexin Bicheng Biomedical Technology Development Co., Ltd. Room 1410, Weixing Building No 63 Zhichun Road Haidian Beijing 100190 / CN | [2011/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JIANG, Haisong Room 1410, Weixing Building No. 63 Zhichun Road Haidian District Beijing 100190 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Jingang Room 1410, Weixing Building No. 63 Zhichun Road Haidian District Beijing 100190 / CN | [2011/43] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/37] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2011/43] | Crowhurst, Charlotte Waveney Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 09832823.0 | 16.12.2009 | WO2009CN01473 | Priority number, date | CN200810239714 | 16.12.2008 Original published format: CN200810239714 | [2011/43] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010069141 | Date: | 24.06.2010 | Language: | ZH | [2010/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2380562 | Date: | 26.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 24.06.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/22, A61K9/28, A61K31/4422, A61P9/10, A61K9/00 | [2013/50] | CPC: |
A61K9/0004 (EP,US);
A61K31/4422 (EP,US);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2011/43] | A61K9/22, A61K9/28, A61K31/4422, A61P9/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | OSMOTISCHE PUMPEN-TABLETTE MIT KONTROLLIERTER FREISETZUNG UND GLEITSCHICHT UND IHRE HERSTELLUNG | [2011/43] | English: | A CONTROLLED-RELEASED OSMOTIC PUMP TABLET WITH LUBRICATING LAYER AND THE PREPARATION THEREOF | [2011/43] | French: | COMPRIME DE POMPE OSMOTIQUE A LIBERATION CONTROLEE COMPRENANT UNE COUCHE LUBRIFIANTE ET PROCEDE DE PREPARATION ASSOCIE | [2011/43] | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.2011 | Translation filed | 29.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.2011 | Search fee paid | 29.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/43] | 07.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/49] | 17.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2013 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5190765 (JAO FRANK [US], et al) [A] 1-14* examples 10-12 *; | [X]WO0025753 (ALZA CORP [US]) [X] 1-8,10,11,13,14 * page 10, line 2 - page 11, line 5 * * page 12, line 23 - page 14, line 5 * * page 16, line 11 - page 18, line 19 * * page 25, line 25 - page 28, line 10 * * page 30, line 8 - page 31, line 5 * * examples 1-8 * * claim - *; | [XI]WO2005030182 (ALZA CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-8,10,11,13,14 * page 43, paragraph 145 - page 47, paragraph 151 * * page 49, paragraph 155 - page 53, paragraph 167 * * page 55, paragraph 173 - page 56, paragraph 174 * * examples 1-7 * * claim - * [I] 9,12 | International search | [A]CN1931167 (GUAGNZHOU BEI S PHARMACEUTICAL [CN]); | [X]US2007166381 (REYES IRAN [US], et al); | [A]CN101128190 (CTC BIO INC [KR]); | [A]CN101167700 (BEIJING HONGLIN PHARMACY CO LT [CN]) |