|
02.06.2021 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.08.2020 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2020 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.06.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2020 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.06.2020 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.06.2020 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.03.2020 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.2020 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.03.2020 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.2020 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
17.03.2020 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
26.09.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.09.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.08.2019 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.07.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2019 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.05.2019 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.05.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2019 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.2019 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.2019 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2019 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.03.2019 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.11.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
28.11.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2018 |
Description |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
28.11.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.08.2018 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.08.2018 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.08.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.2018 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2018 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.07.2018 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2018 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.09.2017 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.2017 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.01.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.01.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.01.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2017 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.11.2016 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.10.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2016 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.07.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.04.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.2015 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.03.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.03.2015 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.2015 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.10.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.10.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
14.10.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.10.2013 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.06.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.06.2013 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.02.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.2013 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.2013 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.02.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.11.2012 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.2012 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2012 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2012 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.08.2012 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.12.2011 |
Communication concerning corrected entries of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2011 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.2011 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.11.2011 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2011 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2011 |
Miscellaneous requests concerning client data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2011 |
Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.2011 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.2011 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2011 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2011 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
24.06.2011 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.06.2011 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2011 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2011 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.06.2011 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.2011 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.11.2010 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.11.2010 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2010 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
24.06.2010 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
30 |