04.11.2015 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 02.12.2015 [2015/49] |
27.07.2015 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
05.02.2015 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
03.07.2014 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
03.07.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.05.2014 |
Change - representative |
published on 18.06.2014 [2014/25] |
30.01.2014 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
18.01.2014 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
19.07.2013 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] |
19.07.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] |
19.07.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] |
14.06.2013 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
14.06.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.01.2013 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
25.05.2012 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
25.05.2012 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
25.05.2012 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
09.04.2012 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
24.02.2012 |
Change - extension states |
published on 28.03.2012 [2012/13] |
22.12.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.09.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] |
30.09.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] |
23.08.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.08.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.08.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.07.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.07.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.07.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|