22.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] |
15.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] |
08.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] |
10.06.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] |
03.06.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.07.2016 [2016/27] |
29.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] |
16.10.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.11.2015 [2015/47] |
09.10.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.11.2015 [2015/46] |
31.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2015 [2015/36] |
24.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] |
27.03.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.04.2015 [2015/18] |
30.01.2015 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 04.03.2015 [2015/10] |
16.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.02.2015 [2015/08] |
05.12.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.01.2015 [2015/02] |
14.11.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.12.2014 [2014/51] |
07.11.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.12.2014 [2014/50] |
31.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.12.2014 [2014/49] |
24.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.11.2014 [2014/48] |
17.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.11.2014 [2014/47] |
10.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.11.2014 [2014/46] |
05.09.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.10.2014 [2014/41] |
08.08.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.09.2014 [2014/37] |
01.08.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.09.2014 [2014/36] |
21.02.2014 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 26.03.2014 [2014/13] |
14.02.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
14.02.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
08.01.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.10.2013 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
13.09.2013 |
Change - French title |
published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] |
06.09.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 09.10.2013 [2013/41] |
06.09.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 09.10.2013 [2013/41] |
06.09.2013 |
Change - German title |
published on 09.10.2013 [2013/41] |
06.09.2013 |
Change - French title |
published on 09.10.2013 [2013/41] |
21.12.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.11.2012 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
08.04.2012 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 09.05.2012 [2012/19] |
08.04.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 09.05.2012 [2012/19] |
08.04.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 09.05.2012 [2012/19] |
02.03.2012 |
Change - extension states |
published on 04.04.2012 [2012/14] |
23.11.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.09.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 19.10.2011 [2011/42] |
16.09.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 19.10.2011 [2011/42] |
25.07.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.07.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.07.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.07.2011 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
13.07.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.07.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|