EP2379933 - WRAPPABLE STYRENIC PIPE INSULATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.2019 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.04.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.12.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ShawCor Ltd. 25 Bethridge Road Toronto, Ontario M9W 1M7 / CA | [2011/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JACKSON, Peter 26 Lake Promenade Toronto, Ontario M8V 2G7 / CA | 02 /
JACKSON, Adam Baldershage 25 7045 Trondheim / NO | [2018/20] |
Former [2011/43] | 01 /
JACKSON, Peter 26 Lake Promenade Toronto Ontario M8V 2G7 / CA | ||
02 /
JACKSON, Adam Baldershage 25 N-7045 Trondheim / NO | Representative(s) | Gervasi, Gemma, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi GmbH Bavariaring 21 80336 München / DE | [2011/43] | Application number, filing date | 09833986.4 | 22.12.2009 | [2018/20] | WO2009CA01891 | Priority number, date | US20080139650P | 22.12.2008 Original published format: US 139650 P | [2011/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010072001 | Date: | 01.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2379933 | Date: | 26.10.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2379933 | Date: | 16.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 01.07.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F16L11/08, F16L59/153, F16L59/02, F16L11/16 | [2018/01] | CPC: |
F16L11/16 (EP,US);
F16L11/083 (EP,US);
F16L59/027 (EP,US);
F16L59/153 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/43] | F16L59/153, F16L11/16, F16L11/20, F16L11/24, F16L59/02, F16L59/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WICKELBARE STYROLISOLIERUNG FÜR EIN ROHR | [2011/43] | English: | WRAPPABLE STYRENIC PIPE INSULATIONS | [2011/43] | French: | ISOLATIONS STYRÉNIQUES ENROULABLES POUR TUYAU | [2011/43] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2011 | Search fee paid | 21.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/43] | 30.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.12.2017 | 12.12.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 15.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 30.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.06.2016 | Opposition(s) | 19.02.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.12.2009 | AT | 16.05.2018 | CY | 16.05.2018 | CZ | 16.05.2018 | DK | 16.05.2018 | EE | 16.05.2018 | ES | 16.05.2018 | FI | 16.05.2018 | HR | 16.05.2018 | LT | 16.05.2018 | LV | 16.05.2018 | MC | 16.05.2018 | MK | 16.05.2018 | PL | 16.05.2018 | PT | 16.05.2018 | SE | 16.05.2018 | SI | 16.05.2018 | SK | 16.05.2018 | SM | 16.05.2018 | TR | 16.05.2018 | BG | 16.08.2018 | GR | 17.08.2018 | IS | 16.09.2018 | IE | 22.12.2018 | LU | 22.12.2018 | MT | 22.12.2018 | BE | 31.12.2018 | CH | 31.12.2018 | LI | 31.12.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 22.12.2009 | |
AT | 16.05.2018 | ||
CY | 16.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
MK | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PT | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
TR | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
IE | 22.12.2018 | ||
LU | 22.12.2018 | ||
MT | 22.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 22.12.2009 | |
AT | 16.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PT | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
TR | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
IE | 22.12.2018 | ||
LU | 22.12.2018 | ||
MT | 22.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PT | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
TR | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
IE | 22.12.2018 | ||
LU | 22.12.2018 | ||
MT | 22.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
TR | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
IE | 22.12.2018 | ||
LU | 22.12.2018 | ||
MT | 22.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
IE | 22.12.2018 | ||
LU | 22.12.2018 | ||
MT | 22.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
IE | 22.12.2018 | ||
LU | 22.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
IE | 22.12.2018 | ||
LU | 22.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
IE | 22.12.2018 | ||
LU | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
LU | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
LU | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 16.05.2018 | |
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 16.05.2018 | |
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | ES | 16.05.2018 | |
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | ES | 16.05.2018 | |
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | ES | 16.05.2018 | |
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | ES | 16.05.2018 | |
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 16.05.2018 | |
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]US3954539 (SMITH JR HUBERT STACY) [I] 1-5,8-13 * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 28 * * figure 2 * [Y] 6,7,14,15; | [I]JPH1190972 (UC SANGYO KK) [I] 1-5,8-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0017] * * figures 5, 6 *; | [YD]US6668866 (GLEJBOL KRISTIAN [DK], et al) [YD] 14,15* the whole document *; | [Y]WO2007055583 (ADVANCED PROD & LOADING AS [NO], et al) [Y] 6,7,14,15 * abstract * | International search | [A]US2797731 (CARLSON JR FRANK A); | [A]US3477891 (HAWERKAMP MANFRED); | [Y]CA950818 (SCHLEGEL ILLINOIS INC); | [X]US3916953 (NAGAYOSHI AKIO, et al); | [Y]US4377186 (GENINI MAURICE [FR], et al); | [A]US4590108 (NIPPE REYNOLD B [US]) |