EP2385035 - PREPARATION METHOD OF DIHYDROINDENE AMIDE COMPOUNDS, THEIR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING COMPOUNDS THEREOF AND USE AS PROTEIN KINASES INHIBITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/45] | PREPARATION METHOD OF DIHYDROINDENE AMIDE COMPOUNDS THEIR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS CONTAING COMPOUNDS THEREOF AND USE AS PROTEIN KINASES INHIBITOR | ||
[2014/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.05.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Harbin Gloria Pharmaceuticals Co., Ltd. No. 29, Beijing Road Limin Economic & Technological Development Zone Harbin, Heilongjiang 150025 / CN | [2011/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Xuqing Room 416 No.2 Building 18 Anning Village East Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | 02 /
XUE, Long Room 416 No.2 Building 18 Anning Village East Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | 03 /
LUO, Juan Room 416 No.2 Building 18 Anning Village East Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2011/45] | Representative(s) | Bösl, Raphael Konrad, et al Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstraße 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/45] | Bösl, Raphael Konrad, et al Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 68 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09834119.1 | 24.12.2009 | WO2009CN76006 | Priority number, date | CN200810176591 | 25.12.2008 Original published format: CN200810176591 | [2011/45] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010072166 | Date: | 01.07.2010 | Language: | ZH | [2010/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2385035 | Date: | 09.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2385035 | Date: | 25.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 01.07.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/14, C07D403/14, A61K31/16, A61P17/06, A61P27/00, A61P29/00, A61P35/00, A61P35/02, A61P9/00, A61P9/10 | [2013/28] | CPC: |
C07D403/14 (EP,US);
C07C233/64 (KR);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P27/00 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07D239/42 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/45] | C07C233/64, A61K31/16, A61P17/06, A61P27/00, A61P29/00, A61P35/00, A61P35/02, A61P9/00, A61P9/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON DIHYDROINDENAMIDVERBINDUNGEN, DEREN PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN, DIE VERBINDUNGEN DAVON ENTHALTEN, UND DEREN VERWENDUNG ALS PROTEINKINASEINHIBITOREN | [2011/45] | English: | PREPARATION METHOD OF DIHYDROINDENE AMIDE COMPOUNDS, THEIR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING COMPOUNDS THEREOF AND USE AS PROTEIN KINASES INHIBITOR | [2014/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE COMPOSÉS D'AMIDE DE DIHYDROINDÈNE, COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES CONTENANT LES COMPOSÉS, ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME INHIBITEUR DE PROTÉINES KINASES | [2011/45] |
Former [2011/45] | PREPARATION METHOD OF DIHYDROINDENE AMIDE COMPOUNDS THEIR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS CONTAING COMPOUNDS THEREOF AND USE AS PROTEIN KINASES INHIBITOR | Entry into regional phase | 08.07.2011 | Translation filed | 08.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 08.07.2011 | Search fee paid | 08.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/45] | 21.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 06.02.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.10.2013 | Opposition(s) | 26.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 25.06.2014 | BG | 25.06.2014 | CY | 25.06.2014 | DK | 25.06.2014 | EE | 25.06.2014 | HR | 25.06.2014 | LT | 25.06.2014 | LV | 25.06.2014 | MC | 25.06.2014 | MK | 25.06.2014 | MT | 25.06.2014 | SI | 25.06.2014 | SK | 25.06.2014 | SM | 25.06.2014 | NO | 25.09.2014 | GR | 26.09.2014 | IS | 25.10.2014 | PT | 27.10.2014 | IE | 24.12.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | BE | 25.06.2014 | |
BG | 25.06.2014 | ||
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
MT | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
SM | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
IE | 24.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BE | 25.06.2014 | |
BG | 25.06.2014 | ||
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
SM | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
IE | 24.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | BE | 25.06.2014 | |
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
SM | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
IE | 24.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | BE | 25.06.2014 | |
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
SM | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
IE | 24.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | BE | 25.06.2014 | |
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
IE | 24.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | BE | 25.06.2014 | |
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
IE | 24.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | BE | 25.06.2014 | |
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 25.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2004005281 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-15* example 50; claim - * | International search | [X]WO2005113494 (AMGEN INC [US], et al); | [A]WO2005113494 (AMGEN INC [US], et al); | [A]CN1944398 (INST OF MEDICINES CHINESE ACAD [CN]) | by applicant | - COHEN, NAT REV. DRUG DISCOVERY, (2002), vol. 1, page 309 | - DRUKER ET AL., N. ENGL. J, MED., (2006), vol. 355, page 2408 | - NARDI ET AL., CURR. OPIN. HEMATOL., (2004), vol. 11, page 35 | - JOENSUU ET AL., N. ENGF. J. MED., (2001), vol. 344, page 1052 | - EDLING ET AL., INT. J. BIOCHEM. CELL BIOL., (2007), vol. 39, page 1995 | - LENNARTSSON ET AL., CURR. CANCER DRUG TARGETS, (2006), vol. 6, page 65 | - REBER ET AL., EUR. J. PHARMACOL, (2006), vol. 533, page 327 | - PANIAGUA ET AL., NAT. CLIN. PROC. RHEUM., (2007), vol. 3, page 190 | - ANDRAE ET AL., GENE DEV., (2008), vol. 22, page 1276 | - PANIAGUA ET AL., NAT. CLIN. PRAC. RHEUM., (2007), vol. 3, page 190 | - LOUVET ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACOD. SCI. USA, (2008), vol. 105, page 18895 | - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, MARK PUBLISHING COMPANY, (1985), page 1418 | - JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCE, (1977), vol. 66, page 2 | - T. HIGUCHI, V. STELLA, Pro-drugs as Novel Delivery Systems, A.C.S. SYMPOSIUM SERIES, vol. 14 | - SZAKACS ET AL., J. MED, CHEM, (2005), vol. 48, page 249 | - Z. SZAKACS ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (2005), vol. 48, page 249 |