29.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
06.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
15.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
11.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] |
28.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] |
21.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.07.2019 [2019/30] |
23.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] |
09.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] |
02.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.12.2018 [2018/49] |
05.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.11.2018 [2018/45] |
21.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] |
18.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.06.2018 [2018/25] |
06.04.2018 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 09.05.2018 [2018/19] |
23.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] |
16.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.03.2018 [2018/12] |
09.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] |
02.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] |
26.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] |
08.12.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] |
01.12.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] |
24.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] |
10.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.12.2017 [2017/50] |
03.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] |
28.04.2017 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 31.05.2017 [2017/22] |
25.04.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
25.04.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
24.04.2017 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
20.03.2017 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
17.03.2017 |
Change - inventor |
|
10.03.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 12.04.2017 [2017/15] |
10.03.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 12.04.2017 [2017/15] |
20.01.2017 |
Change - applicant |
published on 22.02.2017 [2017/08] |
14.12.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.11.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.02.2015 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
24.01.2015 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
24.01.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.03.2014 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
30.11.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.08.2013 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 18.09.2013 [2013/38] |
16.08.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 18.09.2013 [2013/38] |
07.12.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.02.2012 |
Change - extension states |
published on 28.03.2012 [2012/13] |
03.02.2012 |
Change - representative |
published on 07.03.2012 [2012/10] |
24.11.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.07.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 31.08.2011 [2011/35] |
29.07.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 31.08.2011 [2011/35] |
08.04.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.03.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.08.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.07.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.07.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|